Supreme Court

Case: 16-0651    
16-0651
08/26/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
DUDLEY CONSTRUCTION, LTD., RICHARD MARK DUDLEY, AND HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY 
ACT PIPE & SUPPLY, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/05/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al.
04/20/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
03/20/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of petitioners Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al.
12/05/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
08/26/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/05/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Robert A. Swearingen; Argued on behalf of respondent by Lisa M. Norman
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by Lisa M. Norman of Andrews Myers, PC of Houston, Texas.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioners, Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Robert A. Swearingen of The Swearingen Law Firm, Robert A. Swearingen, P.C., of College Station, Texas.
07/13/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to Mr. Swearingen's office regarding the rejected vacation notice.
07/06/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to Mr. Swearingen's office regarding the rejected vacation notice.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 5, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/29/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice submitted by Robert A. Swearingen, attorney for petitioners.
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/05/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al.
05/03/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of Address for respondent attorneys, Lisa M. Norman and Robert A. Plessala. On behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
04/20/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
04/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extenison of Time to file Respondent's Brief the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due April 20, 2017; and Reply brief is due May 5, 2017.
04/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Act Pipe & Supply, Inc.
03/20/2017Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of petitioners Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al.
02/24/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 6th COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
12/05/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedAgreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due December 5, 2016.
11/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
10/21/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than November 21, 2016.
09/20/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/13/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.
08/26/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dudley Construction, Ltd., et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/05/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ACT Pipe & Supply, Inc.RespondentMr. Robert A. Plessala
Mr. W. Jason Walker
Ms. Lisa M. Norman
Dudley, Richard MarkPetitionerMr. Byron Thompson
Mr. Robert A. Swearingen
Hartford Fire Insurance CompanyPetitionerMr. Robert A. Swearingen
Mr. Byron Thompson
Dudley Construction, Ltd.PetitionerMr. Robert A. Swearingen
Mr. Byron Thompson
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 07-14-16 
6th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Josh R. Morriss 
Trial Court Information
361st District Court 
Brazos 
Honorable Steven Lee Smith 
12-000281-CV-361  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site