Supreme Court

Case: 16-0647    
16-0647
08/26/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE STATE OF TEXAS EX REL. GEORGE DARRELL BEST 
PAUL REED HARPER 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/2018Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
07/16/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received on behalf of Thomas B. Cowart.
07/10/2018Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
12/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas in support of Respondent, Paul Reed Harper. Submitted by Joseph R. Larsen of Sedgwick LLP of Houston, Texas.
11/29/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter received on behalf of State of Texas.  Submitted by Cleve W. Doty, Assistant Attorney General, Office of the Texas Attorney General.
11/20/2017Response to Brief filedPetitionerReply to Respondent's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
11/17/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentRespondent's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
11/16/2017Amended Brief filedPetitionerAmended Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of State of Texas.
11/15/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Brief filed on behalf of State of Texas.
03/13/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
02/21/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner’s Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
12/05/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
09/27/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/2018Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
07/16/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received on behalf of Thomas B. Cowart.
07/11/2018Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than July 26, 2018.
07/10/2018Case forwarded to Court  
07/10/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
06/29/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/29/2018Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Boyd delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Johnson and Justice Lehrmann joined.
06/29/2018Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment, with a modification.  Justice Brown delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Guzman, and Justice Devine joined.
(6/29/2018 4:22:27 PM) 160647d.pdf, 160647.pdf, 16-0647.jmt.pdf
12/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas in support of Respondent, Paul Reed Harper. Submitted by Joseph R. Larsen of Sedgwick LLP of Houston, Texas.
11/29/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter received on behalf of State of Texas.  Submitted by Cleve W. Doty, Assistant Attorney General, Office of the Texas Attorney General.
11/20/2017Response to Brief filed Reply to Respondent's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
11/17/2017Post submission brief filed Respondent's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
11/16/2017Amended Brief filed Amended Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of State of Texas.
11/15/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of State of Texas.
11/10/2017Call received Call received from respondent's counsel inquiring if there is a due date for post-submission briefs. Directed her to Internal Operating Procedure XI.B.4 and 5.
11/08/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf petitioner by C. Alfred Mackenzie; Argued on behalf of respondent by Mary H. Barkley
09/15/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper. Oral Argument will be presented by Mary H. Barkley of Cantey Hanger LLP.
09/09/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by C. Alfred Mackenzie of Waco, Texas, filed on behalf of State of Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 8, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/14/2017Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of the State of Texas stating that petitioner does not intend to file a Reply Brief on the Merits.
03/13/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
02/21/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner’s Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
02/02/2017Motion to dismiss disposedDeniedMotion to Dismiss denied
01/25/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/23/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 10th COA
01/20/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than February 21, 2017; Response brief due March 13, 2017; Reply brief due March 28, 2017.
12/12/2016Response to Motion filed Response to Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
12/05/2016Motion to dismiss Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
12/05/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Reed Harper.
11/04/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than December 5, 2016.
10/04/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/28/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Paul Harper.
09/27/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
08/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted, as amended. Petition for Review is due September 28, 2016.
08/26/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Sent email respondent's counsel to inquire whether a response to petitioner's motion will be filed or not.
08/26/2016Amendment to Motion filed  Amended Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of  State of Texas on the Relation George Darrell Best.
08/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of State of Texas on the Relation George Darrell Best.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/10/2018Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesMotion for Rehearing 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Freedom of Information Foundation of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Joseph R. Larsen
State of TexasPetitionerMr. Andrew W. Lucas
Mr. C. Alfred Mackenzie
Cowart, Thomas B.Amicus CuriaeMr. Thomas B. 'Tom' Cowart
Texas Attorney General’s OfficeOther interested party Mr. Cleve Doty
Ms. Nichole Beth Bunker-Henderson
Mr. Brantley D. Starr
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. James E. Davis
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Ms. Angela V. Colmenero
Harper, Paul ReedRespondentMs. Mary H. Barkley
Mr. Christopher A. Brown
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
493 SW3d 105, 04-21-16 
10th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Thomas W. Gray 
Trial Court Information
249th District Court 
Somervell 
Honorable Charles C. Cooke 
C10369 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site