Supreme Court

Case: 16-0626    
16-0626
08/22/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
WILLACY COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT 
SEBASTIAN COTTON & GRAIN, LTD. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/19/2018Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of respondent, Sebastian Cotton & Grain.
06/05/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
05/19/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
03/30/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
01/09/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
09/28/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/30/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due June 13, 2018.
04/30/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
04/27/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/27/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed and remanded to Court of AppealsThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court. Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court.  
(4/27/2018 12:53:11 PM) 160626.pdf, 16-0626.jmt.pdf
01/19/2018Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of respondent, Sebastian Cotton & Grain.
01/10/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Judith A. Hargrove; Argued on behalf of respondent by Thomas M. Michel
12/15/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District. Oral Argument will be presented by Judith A. Hargroce of Hargrove & Evans LLP of Austin, Texas.
12/14/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd. Oral Argument will be presented by Thomas M. Michel of Griffith, Jay & Michel of Forth Worth, Texas.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 10, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/05/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
05/30/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice for Thomas M. Michel, attorney for respondent Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
05/19/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
04/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response brief is due May 19, 2017; Reply brief is due June 5, 2017.
04/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
03/30/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
03/29/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief is due March 30, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Response Brief is due April 19, 2017. Reply Brief is due May 4, 2017.
03/29/2017Electronic communication received from Party Ms. Hargrove provided notice of reinstatement from the State Bar of Texas.
03/28/2017Call received Ms. Hargrove informed the court that she will pay a fee that she owes, and provide the court with written confirmation of the reinstatement.
03/28/2017Electronic communication received from Party Ms. Michel informed the court that Ms. Hargrove is suspended.
03/28/2017Electronic communication received from Party Ms. Michel informed the court that a response to the motion will no longer be filed.
03/24/2017Electronic communication received from Party Ms. Michel informed the court that a response to the motion will be filed on Monday.
03/24/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged respondent counsel. Requested whether or not a response to the motion will be electronically filed.
03/24/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
03/03/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
01/09/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.
12/09/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 9, 2017.
11/08/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/04/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. The petition for review was filed in our Office on September 28, 2016.
10/04/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Ms. Hargrove's office. Requested status of corrected petition.
09/30/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Assisted Ms. Hargrove's office in correcting the electronic format of the petition for review.
09/28/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
09/28/2016Electronic communication received from Party Received email from respondent's counsel to inform the Court that they will be filing a response on or before Friday, September 30.
09/28/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged respondent's counsel to inquire whether they are opposed, or unopposed, to petitioner's second motion.
09/27/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
08/24/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due September 19, 2016.
08/22/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged respondent counsel. Requested whether or not a response to the motion will be filed.
08/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Willacy County Appraisal District.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/13/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Willacy County Appraisal DistrictPetitionerMs. Judith A. Hargrove
Sebastian Cotton & Grain, Ltd.RespondentMs. Lorri Michel
Mr. Thomas M. Michel
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
492 SW3d 824, 04-28-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Nelda V. Rodriguez 
Trial Court Information
197th District Court 
Willacy 
Honorable Migdalia Lopez 
2012 CV-0126-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site