Supreme Court

Case: 16-0617    
16-0617
08/16/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
IN RE THE GUARDIANSHIP OF EDWIN WOOLEY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/28/2017Supplement to ResponseRespondentSupplement to Response to Suggestion of Death and Brief Regarding Mootness filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
08/04/2017Response to Brief filedRespondentResponse to Suggestion of Death and Brief Regarding Mootness filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
03/08/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services.
02/21/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
02/01/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services.
10/31/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services
10/24/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
08/16/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/09/2017Call received Call received from Tarrant County District Clerk's office.
10/06/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
10/06/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling dismissed as mootThe Court vacates the judgments of the court of appeals and trial court and dismisses the case as moot.
09/28/2017Supplement to Response Supplement to Response to Suggestion of Death and Brief Regarding Mootness filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
08/04/2017Response to Brief filed Response to Suggestion of Death and Brief Regarding Mootness filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
07/27/2017Suggestion of Death Suggestion of Death filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 8, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/29/2017Call received Call received from Stephanie Merck in the office of Kelcie Hibbs informing the court that they do not intend to resubmit the struck vacation notice.
06/28/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Left message with assistant for Ms. Kelcie Hibbs regarding struck vacation notice.
06/23/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates STRUCK | Vacation Notice submitted by Kelcie A. Hibbs, counsel for respondent.
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/08/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services.
02/21/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
02/01/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services.
12/12/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due February 1, 2017; Response Brief is due February 21, 2017; Reply Brief is due March 8, 2017.
12/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services.
12/05/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 2, 2017; Response brief due January 23, 2017; Reply brief due February 7, 2017.
10/31/2016Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services
10/24/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Terry Hammond.
09/23/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than October 24, 2016.
08/23/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/22/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Terry Hammond, guardian ad litem for Edwin Wooley.
08/16/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Department of Aging and Disability Services
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/06/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Aging and Disability ServicesPetitionerMr. Stephen Walter Love
Ms. Ashley L. Myrick
Ms. Erika M. Kane
Mr. Marc Edward Rietvelt
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Kristofer S. Monson
Original Applicant for Permanent Guardianship and Court InvestigatorOther interested party Mr. Jeffery C. Arnier
Second Court of Appeals Guardian ad Litem for Edwin WooleyOther interested party Mr. Robert Lee Loudermilk
Proposed Ward of Edwin WooleyOther interested party Mr. John G. Benoist
Terry Hammond, Guardian Ad Litem for Edwin WooleyRespondentMs. Kelcie A. Hibbs
Mr. Monroe Allen (Mike) Windsor
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 06-02-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable LeeAnn Dauphinot 
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Patrick Ferchill 
2014-GD00251-2 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site