Supreme Court

Case: 16-0611    
16-0611
08/15/2016
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
ROSS MANDEL AND LEA MANDEL 
LEWISVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, COUNTY OF DENTON, CITY OF PLANO AND CLAUSSNER HOLDINGS, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/25/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
05/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the City of Plano.
05/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of County of Denton.
04/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Claussner Holdings, LLC.
04/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lewisville ISD.
03/20/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
01/12/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
12/28/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of County of Denton.
11/28/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Lewisville Independent School District.
08/29/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/12/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied with Justice not sitting.(Justice Guzman not sitting)
05/25/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
05/10/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the City of Plano.
05/10/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of County of Denton.
04/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits gratned. Respondent's brief is due May 10, 2017; and Reply brief is due May 25, 2017.
04/11/2017Electronic communication received from Party Email from Mr. Dennis stating he is unopposed to the motion for extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits.
04/10/2017Adoption by another party of brief already filed City of Plano, Texas Joinder in Denton County, Texas' Motion for Extension of Time.
04/10/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. Edward Dennis to determine if petitioners are opposed or unopposed to the motion for extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits.
04/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of County of Denton.
04/10/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Claussner Holdings, LLC.
04/10/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lewisville ISD.
03/20/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
03/10/2017Motion to substitute disposedFiling grantedLewisville ISD's Motion to Substitute Counsel granted.
03/09/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted Mr. Nicholas in reference of the missing fee for the Motion to Substitute Counsel.
03/09/2017Motion to Substitute filed Motion to Substitute Counsel filed on behalf of Lewisville ISD.
02/23/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
01/12/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
12/28/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of County of Denton.
12/28/2016Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7  Respondent City of Plano Adopts by Reference all of the Responses to Petition for Review.
11/30/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on December 28, 2016.
11/28/2016Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7  Respondent Claussner Holdings, LLC Adopts by Reference all of the Responses to Petition for Review.
11/28/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Lewisville Independent School District.
11/28/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Emailed counsel for petitioner to determine if the motion was opposed.
11/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the County of Denton.
10/28/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than November 28, 2016.
09/27/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/20/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of the City of Plano, Texas.
09/19/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Claussner Holdings LLC.
09/19/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of the City of Denton.
09/12/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Lewisville Independent School District.
08/29/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ross Mandel, et al.
08/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. Petition for Review is due on August 29, 2016.
08/15/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Emailed counsel for respondents to determine if a response would be filed.
08/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ross and Lea Mandel.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/12/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mandel, LeaPetitionerMr. Edward Jason Dennis
Mandel, RossPetitionerMr. Edward Jason Dennis
Claussner Holdings, LLCRespondentMr. Joseph Paul Dirik
Mr. Theodore W. Daniel
Lewisville Independent School DistrictRespondentMr. George C. Scherer
Mr. Edward J. (Nick) Nicholas
Mr. David B McCall
County of DentonRespondentMs. Yessika M. Monagas
Mr. Gilbert T. Bragg
Mr. Matthew Tepper
Mr. Ryan L. James
City of PlanoRespondentMr. Charles Joseph Crawford  
Mr. Larry R. Boyd
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
499 SW3d 65, 06-30-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Terrie Livingston 
Trial Court Information
431st District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Jonathan M. Bailey 
2013-70534-431 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site