Supreme Court

Case: 16-0588    
16-0588
08/08/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ALBERT LUJAN D/B/A TEXAS WHOLESALE FLOWER CO. 
NAVISTAR, INC., NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORP., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION AND SANTEX TRUCK CENTERS, LTD. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/26/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
07/31/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Navistar, Inc., et al.
06/09/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
02/09/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
01/17/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Navistar, Inc. and Santex Truck Centers, Ltd.
10/18/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/27/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argument This case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 6, 2018.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
10/27/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
10/27/2017Petition for Review granted  
09/26/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
09/25/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedThird Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Reply brief is due September 26, 2017.
09/25/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
09/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Reply brief is due September 25, 2017.
09/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
08/16/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due September 5, 2017.
08/16/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
07/31/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Navistar, Inc., et al.
06/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on July 31, 2017. Reply Brief is due on August 15, 2017.
06/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Navistar, Inc. and Santex Truck Centers, Ltd.
06/09/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
05/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's brief is due June 9, 2017; Response brief is due June 29, 2017; Reply brief is due July 14, 2017.
05/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
04/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief is due May 10, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Response Brief is due May 30, 2017. Reply Brief is due June 14, 2017.
04/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
03/15/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
03/13/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
03/10/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than April 10, 2017; Response brief due May 1, 2017; Reply brief due May 16, 2017.
02/14/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. Reply was filed in our office on February 9, 2017.
02/14/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
02/13/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Called attorney for petitioner regarding submitting a motion for extension of time.
02/09/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
02/02/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply due February 8, 2017.
02/02/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
01/17/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Navistar, Inc. and Santex Truck Centers, Ltd.
12/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response due February 1, 2017.
12/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Navistar, Inc., et al.
12/02/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 2, 2017.
11/01/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/27/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Navistar Inc. and Santex Truck Centers
10/24/2016Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedFourth Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. Petition for Review was filed on October 18, 2016.
10/19/2016Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Fourth Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
10/18/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
10/05/2016Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThird Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petition for Review is due October 17, 2016.
10/05/2016Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
09/06/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due October 7, 2016.
09/06/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
08/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due September 7, 2016.
08/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert Lujan.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/06/2018Submission (Set to be Heard)Submission (Set to be heard) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
International Truck and Engine Corporation and Santex Truck Centers, Ltd.RespondentMr. Richard A. Sheehy
Mr. Christopher James Kronzer
Mr. William J. Collins III
Mr. Edward Kiss
Navistar International Transportation Corp.RespondentMr. Edward Kiss
Mr. Richard A. Sheehy
Mr. Christopher James Kronzer
Mr. William J. Collins III
Texas Wholesale Flower Co.PetitionerMr. Wesley S. Coddou
Mr. Sean Michael Reagan
Santex Truck Centers, Ltd.RespondentMr. William J. Collins III
Mr. Richard A. Sheehy
Mr. Christopher James Kronzer
Mr. Edward Kiss
Navistar, Inc.RespondentMr. Christopher James Kronzer
Mr. Edward Kiss
Mr. Richard A. Sheehy
Mr. William J. Collins III
Navistar International CorporationRespondentMr. Edward Kiss
Mr. Christopher James Kronzer
Mr. William J. Collins III
Mr. Richard A. Sheehy
Lujan, AlbertPetitionerMr. Sean Michael Reagan
Mr. Wesley S. Coddou
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
503 SW3d 424, 06-23-16 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Kenneth Price Wise 
Trial Court Information
129th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Michael Paul Gomez 
2009-77458 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site