Supreme Court

Case: 16-0558    
16-0558
07/27/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
IN THE INTEREST OF K.S.L., A CHILD 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services.
02/23/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth L. and Sarah C.
02/13/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family & Protective Services.
10/14/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Kenneth Lovelace.
09/19/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sarah C.
07/27/2016Petition for Review (Parental Termination)PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/15/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Mary Beth Welsh; Argued on behalf of respondents by Charles "Chad" Baruch
08/31/2017Letter Filed Letter regarding mistatement in Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth L. and Sarah C.
07/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Kenneth L. and Sarah C. Oral Argument will be presented by Charles "Chad" Baruch of Johnston Tobey Baruch, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
07/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services. Oral Argument will be presented by Mary Beth Welsh of the Bexar County District Attorney's Office.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentOral argument of this cause will be conducted on Friday, September 15, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. at the University of Houston Law Center in Houston, Texas.  See TEX. CONST. ART. V., § 3(a).  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/28/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice for Ms. Welsch: August 31, 2017 thru September 10, 2017.
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/06/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services.
02/23/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth L. and Sarah C.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on February 24, 2017; Reply Brief is due March 6, 2017.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Respondents’ Unopposed Motion for 12-Hour Extension of Time to File Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of S.C. and K.L.
02/13/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family & Protective Services.
02/01/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance - Chad Baruch will serve as lead counsel filed on behalf of S.C. and K.L.
01/31/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/30/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
01/27/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Expedited Briefs on the Merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than February 13, 2017; Response brief due February 23, 2017; Reply brief due March 3, 2017.
10/14/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Kenneth Lovelace.
09/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on October 14, 2016.
09/20/2016Notice requesting filing fee Mailed fee request to attorney for Kenneth L.
09/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kenneth L.
09/19/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sarah C.
09/02/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than September 19, 2016.
08/05/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Kenneth L.
08/04/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Sarah C.
08/02/2016Case forwarded to Court  
07/27/2016Petition for Review (Parental Termination) Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Department of Family and Protective Services.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/15/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Coburn, SarahRespondentMr. Gerald Anthony Uretsky
Ms. Amanda J. Wilhelm
Mr. Charles (Chad) E. Baruch
L., K. S.Other interested party Mr. Jeffrey B. Martinez
Lovelace, KennethRespondentMr. Joseph K. Bohac
Mr. Charles (Chad) E. Baruch
Mr. Richard Purzer
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesPetitionerMs. Sheri Bryce Dye
Mr. Nicolas A. LaHood
Ms. Mary Elizabeth Welsh
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Ren/Pt 
499 SW3d 109, 07-06-16 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rebeca C. Martinez 
Trial Court Information
131st District Court 
Bexar 
Honorable Charles E. Montemayor 
2015-PA-00341  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site