Case: 16-0549    
16-0549
07/25/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
DR. BEHZAD NAZARI, D.D.S., ET AL. 
THE STATE OF TEXAS; XEROX CORPORATION; AND XEROX STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC, F/K/A ACS STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/06/2018Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
02/16/2018Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Brief of Xerox Corp. filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/12/2018Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Xerox Corporation and Xerox State Healthcare, LLC regarding points raised during the Nazari and Xerox oral arguments. Submitted by David M. Gunn and Constance H. Pfeiffer of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
02/05/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
02/05/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits Bench Book filed on behalf of petitioners, Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
01/29/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. Submitted by William R. Peterson of Morgan, Lewis and Bockius LLP of Houston, Texas.
08/14/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
07/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
04/19/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dr. Behad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
01/17/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
12/19/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
08/29/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/21/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due no later than October 26, 2018.
09/20/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of State of Texas.
09/11/2018Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Solicitor General, Kyle Hawkins, replacing Scott Keller.
09/11/2018Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than September 26, 2018.
09/06/2018Case forwarded to Court  
09/06/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
08/06/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Motion for Rehearing is due on September 6, 2018.
08/06/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
07/06/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due August 6, 2018.
07/03/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
06/22/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/22/2018Concurring and Dissenting Opinion deliveredIssuedJustice Lehrmann delivered an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Justice Johnson joined.
06/22/2018Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Justice Brown delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Guzman, and Justice Devine joined.  (Justice Boyd and Justice Blacklock not sitting)
(6/22/2018 11:09:41 AM) 160549cd.pdf, 160549.pdf, 16-0549.jmt.pdf
02/16/2018Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Brief of Xerox Corp. filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/12/2018Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Xerox Corporation and Xerox State Healthcare, LLC regarding points raised during the Nazari and Xerox oral arguments. Submitted by David M. Gunn and Constance H. Pfeiffer of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
02/06/2018Submission Schedule  
02/06/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Jason Ray; Argued on behalf of respondent by Scott A. Keller (Justice Blacklock not sitting)
02/05/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of State of Texas.
02/05/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits Bench Book filed on behalf of petitioners, Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
01/29/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. Submitted by William R. Peterson of Morgan, Lewis and Bockius LLP of Houston, Texas.
01/04/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Scott A. Keller with Office of the Texas Attorney General filed on behalf of State of Texas.
01/03/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioners, Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Jason Ray of Riggs & Ray, P.C. of Austin, Texas.
09/22/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 6, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/22/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/22/2017Petition for Review granted  
08/14/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
07/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due August 14, 2017.
07/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
07/10/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
06/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Respondent's Brief is due on July 10, 2017. Reply Brief is due on July 25, 2017.
06/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
05/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due June 9, 2017; Reply brief is due June 26, 2017.
05/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
04/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dr. Behad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
03/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due April 19, 2017; Respondent's brief is due May 9, 2017; and Reply brief is due May 24, 2017.
03/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
02/24/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 3rd COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
01/17/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
12/22/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. Reply is due January 17, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
12/22/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
12/19/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
11/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response is due December 19, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
11/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
11/04/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than December 5, 2016.
10/04/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/01/2016Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
08/29/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Verified style and party information with petitioner attorney's office.
08/29/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S.
07/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review due August 29, 2016.
07/25/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Behzad Nazari, D.D.S., et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/06/2018Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesMotion for Rehearing 
10/26/2018ResponseResponse requested dueFurther requests for extensions of time will be disfavored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Vivian TeegardinOther interested party Mr. Oscar Xavier Garcia
Dr. Scott MalonePetitioner 
Juan D. Villarreal D.D.S.Petitioner 
Dr. Diana MalonePetitionerMr. Jason D. Ray
Mr. J. Woodfin Jones
Mr. J. A. (Tony) Canales
Richard F. Herrscher, D.D.S., M.S.D., P.C.PetitionerMr. Robert M. Anderton
RGV Smiles by Rocky Salinas, D.D.S. PAPetitionerMr. Richard Bruce Pecore
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Mr. J. Woodfin Jones
Dr. John VondrakPetitionerMr. J. A. (Tony) Canales
Mr. J. Woodfin Jones
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Harlingen Family Dentistry, P.C. a/k/a Practical Business SolutionsPetitioner 
Xerox CorporationAmicus CuriaeMs. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. David M. Gunn
Nazari, D.D.S., BehzadPetitionerMr. J. Woodfin Jones
Mr. Mitchell A. Toups
Mr. Jason D. Ray
Mr. E. Hart Green
Dr. Wael KanaanOther interested party Philip H. Hilder
Mr. William Graham
Xerox State Healthcare LLCAmicus CuriaeMs. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. David M. Gunn
M & M Orthodontics PAPetitionerMr. J. A. (Tony) Canales
National Orthodontix, Mgmt., PLLCPetitionerMr. Jason D. Ray
Mr. J. A. (Tony) Canales
Mr. J. Woodfin Jones
Series LLC d/b/a Harlingen Family Dentistry GroupPetitioner 
Dr. Richard F. HerrscherPetitionerMr. Robert M. Anderton
Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of AmericaAmicus CuriaeMr. William R. Peterson
Antoine Dental CenterPetitioner 
The State of TexasRespondentMr. Raymond C. Winter
Mr. J. Campbell Barker
Mr. Philip A. Lionberger
Mr. Kyle D. Hawkins
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Smith, MichellePetitionerMr. J. A. (Tony) Canales
ACS State Healthcare, LLCRespondentMr. William C. Webb
Ms. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. Christopher R. Cowan
Mr. Eric J.R. Nichols
Mr. Robert C. Walters
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Dismiss/Pt 
497 SW3d 169, 06-17-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable David E. Puryear 
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Stephen Yelenosky 
D-1-GN-14-005380 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site