Supreme Court

Case: 16-0542    
16-0542
07/22/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
FORT WORTH TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, MCDONALD TRANSIT ASSOCIATES, INC., MCDONALD TRANSIT, INC., AND LESHAWN VAUGHN 
MICHELE RODRIGUEZ AND NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/11/2018Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedRespondents' Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
11/07/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
03/28/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
03/13/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
03/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of New Hampshire Insurance Company.
02/21/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
11/21/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
11/21/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of New Hampshire Insurance Company.
09/12/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Dallas Area Rapid Transit.
09/06/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/30/2018Case Stored e-stored
06/22/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/22/2018Corrected opinion The dissenting opinion issued April 27, 2018 is corrected.
(6/22/2018 10:32:50 AM) 160542d_cr.pdf
06/22/2018Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
05/14/2018Response Waiver filed Response Waiver to Motion for Rehearing and Letter to Clerk filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
05/11/2018Case forwarded to Court  
05/11/2018Motion for Rehearing Respondents' Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
04/27/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/27/2018Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Johnson delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Lehrmann and Justice Boyd joined.
04/27/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed/remanded to trial courtThe Court affirms in part and reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Guzman, Justice Devine, and Justice Brown joined.  Justice Blacklock did not participate in the decision.
(4/27/2018 12:18:44 PM) 160542d.pdf, 160542.pdf, 16-0542.jmt.pdf
11/08/2017Submission Schedule Submission Schedule for November 8, 2017.
11/08/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Timothy G. Chovanec; Argued on behalf of respondent, Michele Rodriguez, by J. Mark Sudderth; Argued on behalf of respondent, New Hampshire Ins. Co., by John V. Fundis
11/07/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
10/09/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of New Hampshire Insurance Company. Oral Argument will be presented by John V. Fundis of Downs Stanford, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
10/09/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of respondent, Michele Rodriguez. Oral Argument will be presented by J. Mark Sudderth of Noteboom The Law Firm of Hurst, Texas.
10/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Timothy Chovanec of Fort Worth, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 8, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/16/2017Motion to Amend disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion to Amend or Supplement Brief on the Merits to Cite Additional Authorities granted
06/16/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/16/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/02/2017Motion to Amend Filed Unopposed Motion to Amend Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
03/28/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
03/13/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
03/10/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of New Hampshire Insurance Company.
02/21/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
01/25/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/23/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
01/20/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than February 21, 2017; Response brief due March 13, 2017; Reply brief due March 28, 2017.
11/21/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
11/21/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of New Hampshire Insurance Company.
10/21/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than November 21, 2016.
09/20/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/15/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of New Hampshire Insurance Company.
09/12/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Dallas Area Rapid Transit.
09/06/2016Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Michele Rodriguez.
09/06/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
07/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due September 7, 2016.
07/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Fort Worth Transportation Authority, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/30/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fort Worth Transportation AuthorityPetitionerMr. Timothy G. Chovanec
Mr. Mark G. Creighton
New Hampshire Insurance CompanyRespondentMr. John V. Fundis
Rodriguez, MicheleRespondentMr. J. Mark Sudderth
Dallas Area Rapid TransitAmicus CuriaeJanith Lewis-Bryant
John Scott Carlson
McDonald Transit, Inc.PetitionerMr. Mark G. Creighton
Mr. Timothy G. Chovanec
Vaughn, LeshawnPetitionerMr. Mark G. Creighton
Mr. Timothy G. Chovanec
McDonald Transit Associates, Inc.PetitionerMr. Timothy G. Chovanec
Mr. Mark G. Creighton
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
546 SW3d 180, 06-23-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable LeeAnn Dauphinot 
Trial Court Information
67th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Donald J. Cosby 
067-258065-12 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site