Supreme Court

Case: 16-0505    
16-0505
07/07/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
MURPHY EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION COMPANY—USA, A DELAWARE CORPORATION 
SHIRLEY ADAMS, CHARLENE BURGESS, WILLIE MAE HERBST JASIK, WILLIAM ALBERT HERBST, HELEN HERBST, AND R. MAY OIL & GAS COMPANY, LTD. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/27/2018Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter of National Association of Royalty Owners-Texas, Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association, G. Wade Caldwell, David Drez, James Holmes, Alfred A. Steinle, Walker C. Friedman, Allen D. Cummings, Richard L. Leshin, George Parker Young, Catherine M. Stone, John Petry, Stephen Ahl, Dick Watt, Jim Drought, Calhoun Bobbitt, Joseph Fitzsimons and Robert Park. Submitted by Robert M. Park and Joseph B.C. Fitzsimons of UHL, FITZSIMONS, JEWETT, BURTON
& WOLFF, PLLC.
07/18/2018Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
12/08/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA.
12/07/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of petitioners, Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of respondents, Shirley Adams, et al.
11/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Chesapeake Eagle Ford MDL Royalty Owners in Support of Respondents' Brief on the Merits. Submitted by Catherine M. Stone of Langley & Banack, Inc. of San Antonio, Texas.
05/23/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Response to Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil and Gas Association filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
05/02/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedAmicus Curiae Hyperlinked version of the Amicus Brief of Texas Oil & Gas Association. Submitted by Charles R. Watson of Davis, Gerald & Cremer of Austin, Texas.
05/01/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil and Gas Association. Submitted by Charles R. Watson of Davis, Gerald & Cremer of Austin, Texas.
03/29/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
03/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Land & Mineral Owners Association in support of Respondents. Submitted by Joseph Fitzsimons, Robert Park and Dana Deaton of Uhl, Fitzsimons, Jewett & Burton, PLLC of San Antonio, Texas.
03/06/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
02/01/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
10/24/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA, A Delaware Corporation.
09/30/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
08/31/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/27/2018Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter of National Association of Royalty Owners-Texas, Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association, G. Wade Caldwell, David Drez, James Holmes, Alfred A. Steinle, Walker C. Friedman, Allen D. Cummings, Richard L. Leshin, George Parker Young, Catherine M. Stone, John Petry, Stephen Ahl, Dick Watt, Jim Drought, Calhoun Bobbitt, Joseph Fitzsimons and Robert Park. Submitted by Robert M. Park and Joseph B.C. Fitzsimons of UHL, FITZSIMONS, JEWETT, BURTON
& WOLFF, PLLC.
07/18/2018Case forwarded to Court  
07/18/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
06/11/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file motion for Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due on July 18, 2018.
06/11/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
06/01/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/01/2018Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Johnson delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Green, Justice Guzman, and Justice Boyd joined.
06/01/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed, trial court judgment reinstatedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and reinstates the trial court's judgment as modified. Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Devine, Justice Brown, and Justice Blacklock joined.  
(6/1/2018 1:38:41 PM) 160505d.pdf, 160505.pdf, 16-0505.jmt.pdf
05/31/2018Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of Address filed on behalf of Charles R."Skip" Watson.
12/08/2017Post submission brief filed Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA.
12/07/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
12/05/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Macey Reasoner Stokes; Argued on behalf of respondents by Mary A. Keeney
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of petitioners, Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of respondents, Shirley Adams, et al.
11/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Chesapeake Eagle Ford MDL Royalty Owners in Support of Respondents' Brief on the Merits. Submitted by Catherine M. Stone of Langley & Banack, Inc. of San Antonio, Texas.
11/20/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA, a Delaware Corporation. Oral Argument will be presented by Macey Reasoner Stokes of Baker Botts, L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
11/17/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondents, Shirley Adams, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Mary A. Keeney of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC of Austin, Texas.
10/27/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 5, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
10/27/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
10/27/2017Petition for Review granted  
05/23/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Respondent's Response to Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil and Gas Association filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
05/02/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of the Amicus Brief of Texas Oil & Gas Association. Submitted by Charles R. Watson of Davis, Gerald & Cremer of Austin, Texas.
05/01/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil and Gas Association. Submitted by Charles R. Watson of Davis, Gerald & Cremer of Austin, Texas.
03/29/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
03/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Land & Mineral Owners Association in support of Respondents. Submitted by Joseph Fitzsimons, Robert Park and Dana Deaton of Uhl, Fitzsimons, Jewett & Burton, PLLC of San Antonio, Texas.
03/08/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on March 29, 2017.
03/08/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
03/06/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
02/15/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's Brief is due on March 7, 2017. Reply Brief is due on March 22, 2017.
02/15/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
02/01/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
12/20/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's Brief is due February 1, 2017; Respondent's Brief is due February 21, 2017; and Reply Brief is due March 8, 2017.
12/20/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, A Delaware Corporation.
12/15/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/05/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 2, 2017; Response brief due January 23, 2017; Reply brief due February 7, 2017.
10/24/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA, A Delaware Corporation.
10/06/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. The Reply is due October 24, 2016.
10/06/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
10/04/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/30/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shirley Adams, et al.
08/31/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company—USA.
07/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due August 31, 2016.
07/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company–USA, A Delaware Corporation.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/18/2018Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesMotion for Rehearing 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chesapeake Eagle Form MDL Royaly OwnersAmicus CuriaeMr. Ruben Valadez
Mr. George Parker Young
Ms. Linda S. Mcdonald
Vincent P. Circelli
Mr. John W. Petry
Kelli L. Walter
Mr. Stephen Ray Smith
Ms. Catherine M. Stone
Mr. James W. Christian
Texas Oil & Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Charles R. 'Skip' Watson Jr.
Herbst, HelenRespondentMs. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. John B. McFarland
R. May Oil & Gas Company, Ltd.RespondentMr. John B. McFarland
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Jasik, Willie Mae HerbstRespondentMr. John B. McFarland
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Burgess, CharleneRespondentMr. John B. McFarland
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Murphy Exploration & Production Company–USA, A Delaware CorporationPetitionerMr. J. Mark Little  
Mr. Jason A. Newman
Ms. Macey Reasoner Stokes
Texas Land & Mineral Owners Association.Amicus CuriaeMr. Robert Park
Mr. Joseph B.C. Fitzsimons
Dana B. Deaton
National Association of Royalty Owners-Texas, Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association, G. Wade Caldwell, David Drez, James Holmes, Alfred A. Steinle, Walker C. Friedman, Allen D. Cummings, Richard L. Leshin, George Parker Young, Catherine M. Stone,Amicus CuriaeMr. Robert Park
Mr. George Parker Young
Mr. Richard L. Leshin
Mr. Allen D. Cummings
Mr. James A. Holmes
Mr. Joseph B.C. Fitzsimons
Ms. Catherine M. Stone
Mr. John W. Petry
Mr. Dick Watt
Mr. Stephen J. Ahl
Mr. Calhoun Bobbitt
Mr. G. Wade Caldwell
Mr. Walker C. Friedman
Mr. James L. Drought
Mr. David Jacob Drez III
Alfred A. Steinle
Adams, ShirleyRespondentMs. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. John B. McFarland
Herbst, William AlbertRespondentMr. John B. McFarland
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
497 SW3d 510, 06-15-16 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Patricia O. Alvarez 
Trial Court Information
218th District Court 
Atascosa 
Honorable Stella H. Saxon 
13-05-0466-CVA 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site