Supreme Court

Case: 16-0498    
16-0498
07/05/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS 
JEFFERSON COUNTY CONSTABLES ASSOCIATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/02/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerPetitioner's Letter citing an Opinion of the Ninth Court of Appeals in Jefferson County v. Stines, 523 S.W. 3d 691 (Tex.App.—Beaumont, 2017, pet pending) filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
11/02/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Combined Law Enforcement Associations of Texas (CLEAT) submitted by B. Craig Deats and Matt Bachop of Deats, Durst & Owen, P.L.L.C. of Austin, Texas.
10/24/2017Additional citations received.RespondentLetter regarding additional citations filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constables Association.
02/10/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
02/06/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constable's Association.
01/17/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
10/28/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petiton for Review filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constable’s Association.
08/22/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Jefferson County.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Kathleen M. Kennedy; Argued on behalf of respondent by Andrew Lipton
11/03/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Andrew Lipton as additional counsel for respondent, Jefferson County Constable Association.
11/02/2017Additional citations received. Petitioner's Letter citing an Opinion of the Ninth Court of Appeals in Jefferson County v. Stines, 523 S.W. 3d 691 (Tex.App.—Beaumont, 2017, pet pending) filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
11/02/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Combined Law Enforcement Associations of Texas (CLEAT) submitted by B. Craig Deats and Matt Bachop of Deats, Durst & Owen, P.L.L.C. of Austin, Texas.
10/24/2017Additional citations received. Letter regarding additional citations filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constables Association.
10/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constable's Association. Oral Argument will be presented by Andrew Lipton of Hobson & Bradley of Nederland, Texas.
09/15/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Jefferson County, Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Kathleen M. Kennedy of Jefferson County District Attorney's Office of Beaumont, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
03/31/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/31/2017Petition for Review granted  
02/10/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
02/06/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constable's Association.
01/17/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
01/10/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/19/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
12/16/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 17, 2017; Response brief due February 6, 2017; Reply brief due February 21, 2017.
10/28/2016Call received Mr. Bradley informed the court that he will work on the corrections needed, and resubmit the response by next week.
10/28/2016Response to Petition Response to Petiton for Review filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constable’s Association.
09/30/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than October 31, 2016.
08/30/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/25/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Jefferson County Constables Assocation.
08/22/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jefferson County.
07/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due August 22, 2016.
07/05/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jefferson County, Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/07/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jefferson County Constables AssociationRespondentAndrew Lipton
Mr. Lance P. Bradley
Jefferson County, TexasPetitionerMs. Kathleen M. Kennedy
Combined Law Enforcement Associations of Texas (CLEAT)Amicus CuriaeMr. Matthew Bradley Bachop
Mr. B. Craig Deats
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
512 SW3d 434, 05-05-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Gregory Thomas Perkes 
Trial Court Information
60th District Court 
Jefferson 
Honorable Gary Sanderson 
B-191,390 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site