Supreme Court

Case: 16-0457    
16-0457
06/16/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE STATE OF TEXAS 
BERNARD MORELLO 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/08/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
05/24/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bernard J. Morello.
04/19/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/03/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
01/02/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
08/19/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of State of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Craig J. Pritzlaff; Argued on behalf of respondent by Jacqueline Lucci Smith
09/27/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Bernard Morello. Oral Argument will be presented by Jacqueline Lucci Smith of Lucci Smith Law, PLLC of Houston, Texas.
09/27/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, the State of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Craig J. Pritzlaff of the Office of the Attorney General of Texas of Austin, Texas.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/08/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
05/24/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response Brief was filed May 24, 2017.
05/24/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
05/24/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bernard J. Morello.
05/24/2017Call received Ms. Smith will file a motion for extension of time for to file the respondent's brief on the merits.
05/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's brief is due May 23, 2017; Reply brief is due June 7, 2017.
05/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
04/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
03/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due April 19, 2017; Respondent's brief is due May 9, 2017; Reply brief is due May 24, 2017.
03/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/24/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 3rd COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
02/03/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
01/10/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply is due February 6, 2017.
01/10/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of State of Texas.
01/02/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
12/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Response is due January 2, 2017.
12/20/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
11/18/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Ms. Smith. Requested that the motion for extension of time to file the response be resubmitted so that the fee is paid.
11/18/2016Motion to substitute disposedFiling grantedMotion to Substitute is granted.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response is due December 21, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
11/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
11/17/2016Motion to Substitute filed Motion to Substitute filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
10/21/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than November 21, 2016.
09/20/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/13/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Bernard Morello.
08/19/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of State of Texas.
07/18/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due August 19, 2016.
07/18/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
06/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas has been granted. Petition for Review is due July 20, 2016.
06/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/07/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morello, BernardRespondentMs. Mary W. Koks
Ms. Jacqueline Lucci Smith
Mr. James M. Juranek
Taylor L. Shipman
Mr. Keith Walton Lapeze
Mr. Stephen A. Doggett
State of TexasPetitionerMs. Linda B. Secord
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Craig J. Pritzlaff
Ms. Priscilla M. Hubenak
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Brantley David Starr
Mr. James E. Davis
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 05-06-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable David E. Puryear 
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Rhonda G. Hurley 
D-1-GV-06-000627 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site