Supreme Court

Case: 16-0434    
16-0434
06/09/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
DIAMOND OFFSHORE SERVICES LIMITED AND DIAMOND OFFSHORE SERVICES COMPANY 
WILLIE DAVID WILLIAMS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of petitioners, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
12/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of respondents, Willie David Williams.
06/06/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Servies Limited, et al.
04/19/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
04/13/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
02/16/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
11/09/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
10/12/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
08/12/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Constance H. Pfeiffer; Argued on behalf of respondent by Jeffrey L. Oldham
12/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of petitioners, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
12/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of respondents, Willie David Williams.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Willie David Williams. Oral Argument will be presented by Jeffrey L. Oldham of Bracewell LLP of Houston, Texas.
11/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted by petitioners, Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Constance H. Pfeiffer of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/06/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Servies Limited, et al.
05/30/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Reply brief is due June 6, 2017.
05/30/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
05/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due May 30, 2017.
04/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
04/19/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
04/13/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
04/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response Brief is due April 13, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due April 28, 2017.
04/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits on behalf of Willie David Williams.  
03/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response brief is due April 7, 2017; Reply brief is due April 24, 2017.
03/03/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
02/16/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
01/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioners' brief is due February 16, 2017; Response brief is due March 8, 2017; Reply brief is due March 23, 2017.
01/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
01/10/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/19/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
12/16/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 17, 2017; Response brief due February 6, 2017; Reply brief due February 21, 2017.
11/09/2016Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
10/27/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply is due November 10, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
10/27/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Ltd.
10/18/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/12/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
10/03/2016Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedResident Attorney, Jeffrey L. Oldham's Motion in Support of Walter Steinman's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
10/03/2016Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedWalter Z. Steinman's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice granted
10/03/2016Pro hac vice motion filed Resident Attorney, Jeffrey L. Oldham's Motion in Support of Walter Steinman's Motion Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
10/03/2016Pro hac vice motion filed Out of the State Attorney, Walter Z. Steinman's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
09/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due October 12, 2016.
09/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Willie David Williams.
08/12/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
07/12/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review August 12, 2016.
07/12/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Services Limited, et al.
06/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due July 13, 2016.
06/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Diamond Offshore Serv. Ltd.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/07/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Diamond Offshore Services CompanyPetitionerMs. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Kyle A. Lawrence
Diamond Offshore Services LimitedPetitionerMs. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. Kyle A. Lawrence
Mr. David M. Gunn
Williams, Willie DavidRespondentMr. Jeffrey L. Oldham
Mr. Michael Patrick Doyle
Mr. Walter Z. Steinman
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
510 SW3d 57, 07-21-15 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sherry Radack 
Trial Court Information
164th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Alexandra Ilana Smoots-Hogan 
2011-31922 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site