Supreme Court

Case: 16-0431    
16-0431
06/08/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
STARWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC BY AND THROUGH NORMA GONZALEZ 
DON SWAIM AND ROSE WALKER, L.L.P. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/12/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
03/07/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Don Swaim, et al.
01/31/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
10/27/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC, by and through Norma Gonzalez.
10/14/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Don Swaim and Rose Walker, LLP.
07/26/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/29/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
09/29/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court.  Per Curiam Opinion
(9/29/2017 4:53:29 PM) 160431.pdf, 16-0431.jmt.pdf
09/29/2017Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
09/29/2017Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
04/12/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
03/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due April 12, 2017.
03/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
03/07/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Don Swaim, et al.
02/16/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due March 7, 2017; and Reply brief is due March 22, 2017.
02/16/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Don Swaim, et al.
01/31/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
12/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief due February 1, 2017; Response brief due February 21, 2017; Reply brief due March 8, 2017.
12/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
12/15/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/05/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 2, 2017; Response brief due January 23, 2017; Reply brief due February 7, 2017.
10/27/2016Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC, by and through Norma Gonzalez.
10/14/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Don Swaim and Rose Walker, LLP.
09/30/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on October 17, 2016.
09/30/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Don Swaim, et al.
09/02/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than October 3, 2016.
08/02/2016Case forwarded to Court  
07/27/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Don Swaim, et al.
07/26/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starwood Management, LLC.
06/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due July 27, 2016.
06/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starwood Management.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/16/2017StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Swaim, DonRespondentMr. Thad D. Spalding
Mr. Daniel D. Tostrud
Ms. Morgan A. McPheeters
Mr. Matthew E. Last
Rose Walker, L.L.P.RespondentMs. Morgan A. McPheeters
Mr. Matthew E. Last
Mr. Thad D. Spalding
Mr. Daniel D. Tostrud
Starwood Management, LLC, by and through Norma GonzalezPetitionerMs. Anna E. Fredrickson
Mr. Byron C. Keeling
Mr. Ross A. Sears II
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 03-07-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Douglas S. Lang 
Trial Court Information
193rd District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Carl Haralson Ginsberg 
Dc-13-112760-L 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site