Supreme Court

Case: 16-0412    
16-0412
06/03/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
TRO-X, L.P. 
ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/24/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TRO-X L.P.
04/14/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
04/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
01/03/2017Amended Brief filedPetitionerAmended Petitioner's Brief with corrected word count filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
12/30/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
09/22/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
09/07/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
06/03/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/25/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/25/2018Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Justice Johnson delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/25/2018 4:18:43 PM) 160412.pdf, 16-0412.jmt.pdf
01/09/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Samuel J. Stennis and W. Clark Lea; Argued on behalf of respondent by Deborah G. Hankinson
12/13/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of petitioner, TRO-X, L.P. Oral Argument will be presented by Samuel J. Stennis and W. Clark Lea of Cotton, Bledsoe, Tighe & Dawson, P.C. of Midland, Texas.
12/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Deborah G. Hankinson with Hankinson LLP of Dallas, Texas, filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
09/22/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 9, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/22/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/22/2017Petition for Review granted  
05/24/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TRO-X L.P.
04/20/2017Motion to substitute disposedFiling grantedMotion to Withdraw Counsel and Substitute is granted.
04/19/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due May 25, 2017.
04/19/2017Motion to Substitute filed Motion to Withdraw Rick G. Strange and Substitute David W. Lauritzen as counsel filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
04/19/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
04/14/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
04/10/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
03/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedThird Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Response Brief is due April 10, 2017. Reply Brief is due April 25, 2017.
03/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent’s Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corp.
02/16/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. Response Brief is due March 24, 2017. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Reply Brief is due April 10, 2017.
02/16/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corp.
01/19/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response Brief is due February 22, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due March 9, 2017.
01/19/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corp.
01/12/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Deborah G. Hankinson and Stephanie Dooley Nelson on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
01/03/2017Amended Brief filed Amended Petitioner's Brief with corrected word count filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
12/30/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
12/06/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/05/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 8th COA
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 2, 2017; Response brief due January 23, 2017; Reply brief due February 7, 2017.
09/22/2016Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
09/07/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
08/02/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response is due September 7, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
08/02/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
07/08/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than August 8, 2016.
06/07/2016Case forwarded to Court  
06/06/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation.
06/03/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of TRO-X, L.P.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/11/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anadarko Petroleum CorporationRespondentMr. Harper Estes
Mr. Derek D. Cook
Ms. Stephanie D. Nelson
Mr. William Richard (Rick) Thompson II
Ms. Deborah G. Hankinson
TRO-X, L.P.PetitionerMr. Samuel J. Stennis  
Mr. W. Clark Lea
Mr. David W. Lauritzen
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
511 SW3d 778, 03-18-16 
8th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Yvonne Rodriguez 
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court 
Ward 
Honorable Bob Parks 
14-02-23262-CVW 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site