Supreme Court

Case: 16-0347    
16-0347
05/12/2016
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
RICHARDSON EAST BAPTIST CHURCH 
PHILADELPHIA INSURANCE COMPANY AND JAMES GREENHAW 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/21/2017Additional citations received.RespondentLetter regarding additional authorities filed on behalf of James Greenhaw.
08/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Office of Public Insurance Counsel received. Submitted by Joseph R. Matetich of Office of Public Insurance Counsel of Austin, Texas.
08/16/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard East Baptist Church.
06/30/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of James Greenshaw.
06/30/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.
05/09/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
11/16/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse filed on behalf of James Greenhaw.
11/16/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Philadelphia Insurance Co.
07/16/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motin for Rehearing granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Motion for Rehearing is due December 8, 2017.
11/09/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. William Pilat to determine if respondent will be filing a written response in opposition to petitioner's second motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing.
11/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
10/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing due November 8, 2017.
10/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
09/22/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/21/2017Additional citations received. Letter regarding additional authorities filed on behalf of James Greenhaw.
08/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Office of Public Insurance Counsel received. Submitted by Joseph R. Matetich of Office of Public Insurance Counsel of Austin, Texas.
08/16/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard East Baptist Church.
07/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Reply Brief is due August 16, 2017.
07/17/2017Electronic communication received from Party Per email from Mr. William Pilat, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is not opposed to Petitioner’s Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.  
07/17/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to counsel for respondent Philadelphia Insurance Company inquiring whether they are opposed or unopposed to the motion for extension of time.
07/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
06/30/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of James Greenshaw.
06/30/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.
05/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Responses Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due June 30, 2017; Reply Brief is due July 17, 2017.
05/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of respondents, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and James Greenhaw.
05/09/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
04/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted in partMotion for Extension of Time is granted in part. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due May 9, 2017. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Response Brief on the Merits is due May 30, 2017. Reply Brief on the Merits is due June 14, 2017.
04/27/2017Reply to Response to Motion Reply in support of Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
04/27/2017Response to Motion filed Response to Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co.
04/25/2017Electronic communication received from Party Mr. William Pilat will be filing a written response in opposition to petitioner's third motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits no later than April 26, 2017.
04/25/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. William Pilat to determine if Philadelphia Insurance Company is opposed or unopposed to petitioner's third motion for extension of time.
04/24/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
03/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief is due April 24, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will not be considered. Response brief is due May 15, 2017. Reply Brief is due May 30, 2017.
03/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
02/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due March 23, 2017; Respondent's brief is due April 12, 2017; and Reply brief is due April 27, 2017.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
01/25/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/23/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
01/20/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than February 21, 2017; Response brief due March 13, 2017; Reply brief due March 28, 2017.
11/16/2016Response to Petition Response filed on behalf of James Greenhaw.
11/16/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Philadelphia Insurance Co.
09/20/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on November 16, 2016.
09/20/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and James Greenhaw.
09/16/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due October 17, 2016.
08/16/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/15/2016Response Waiver filed Called attorney for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company following up on struck response waiver.
08/10/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.
07/29/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of James Greenhaw.
07/18/2016Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThird Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petition is due on July 18, 2016.
07/18/2016Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
07/18/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to legal assistant of Mr. Kelly. Informed her that a motion for extension of time is required for petition.
07/16/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
06/29/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due July 15, 2016.
06/16/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voice mail message for Mr. Andrew Edelman asking if he was opposed or unopposed to the second motion for extension of time to file petition for review.
06/16/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Mr. William Pilat and he is opposed to the second motion for extension of time to file petition for review; however, he will not be filing a written response.
06/15/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richardso East Baptist Church.
05/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due June 15, 2016.
05/16/2016Amendment to Motion filed  Amended Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of  Richardson East Baptist Church.
05/13/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted petitioner's counsel to request to refile the motion and include the respondent's counsel contact information.
05/12/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension to file their Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richardson East Baptist Church.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/08/2017StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed. No further extensions of time will be considered
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Philadelphia Insurance CompanyRespondentMr. William Robert Pilat
Greenhaw, JamesRespondentMr. Andrew L. Edelman
Mr. Bruce R. Wilkin  
Mr. Jay W. Brown
Texas Office of Public Insurance CounselAmicus CuriaeJoseph Matetich
Richardson East Baptist ChurchPetitionerMr. Kirk L. Pittard
Mr. Peter M. Kelly
Ms. Shannon Elizabeth Loyd
Mr. Thad D. Spalding
Mr. F. Leighton Durham III
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 03-30-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Lana Rolf Myers 
Trial Court Information
298th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Emily G. Tobolowsky 
DC-13-13868-M 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site