Supreme Court

Case: 16-0337    
16-0337
05/10/2016
Second Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
STATE OFFICE OF RISK MANAGEMENT 
EDNA A. MARTINEZ 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
02/23/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
02/23/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
02/08/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
02/06/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentCross-Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
01/17/2017Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Cross-Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
01/13/2017Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
10/25/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
10/07/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
07/19/2016Petition for Review #2PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
05/10/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/12/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent by Emily R. Jakobeit; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner by Kenneth W. Howell
10/12/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent by Emily R. Jakobeit; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner by Kenneth W. Howell
10/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
09/06/2017Call received Call received from counsel, Ms. Emily R. Jakobeit, to confirm that she is presenting oral argument for petitioner and cross-respondent, the State Office of Risk Management.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Cross-Petitioner Edna A. Martinez. Oral Argument will be presented by Kenneth W. Howell of San Antonio, Texas.
08/25/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, State Office of Risk Management. Oral Argument will be presented by Emily R. Jakobeit of the Office of the Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 12, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 12, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/16/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/16/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
06/16/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/16/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/01/2017Call received Call received from Attorney General's office to verify that the Court has received all briefs from petitioner.
02/23/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
02/23/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
02/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on February 23, 2017.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna Martinez.
02/08/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
02/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due February 8, 2017; Reply Brief is due February 23, 2017.
02/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
02/06/2017Brief on the Merits Cross-Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
01/26/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice for Emily Jakobeit, attorney for the State Office of Risk Management.
01/17/2017Brief on the Merits Cross-Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
01/13/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
01/09/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/19/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
12/16/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 17, 2017; Response brief due February 6, 2017; Reply brief due February 21, 2017.
10/25/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
10/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due October 25, 2016.
10/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
10/07/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
09/09/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than October 10, 2016.
08/09/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/09/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/08/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
07/26/2016Call received Call received from petitioner regarding struck petition.
07/20/2016Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petition for Review was filed July 19, 2016.
07/19/2016Petition for Review #2 Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
07/19/2016Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
07/08/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due July 18, 2016.
07/07/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
06/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez has been granted. Petition for Review is due July 6, 2016.
06/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review #2 filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
06/09/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Edna A. Martinez.
05/10/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of State Office of Risk Management.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/12/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Office of Risk ManagementPetitionerMs. Kara Lynne Kennedy
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. James E. Davis
Mr. Brantley D. Starr
Ms. Emily R. Jakobeit
Sandra Horne
Martinez, Edna A.RespondentMr. Kenneth W. Howell
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 02-10-16 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Karen A. Angelini 
Trial Court Information
37th District Court 
Bexar 
Honorable Antonia Arteaga 
2001-CI-17102 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site