Supreme Court

Case: 16-0336    
16-0336
05/10/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
URI, INC. 
KLEBERG COUNTY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/29/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerResponse to Kleberg County's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
11/08/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Brief filed on behalf of respondent Kleberg County.
06/12/2017Supplemental Letter BriefPetitionerSupplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
05/12/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
04/12/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
02/21/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
12/02/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
10/19/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
06/15/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/23/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
03/23/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment.  Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court. Justice Blacklock did not participate in the decision.
(3/23/2018 2:41:31 PM) 160336.pdf, 16-0336.jmt.pdf
11/29/2017Post submission brief filed Response to Kleberg County's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
11/13/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion for Leave to file Post-Submission Brief granted
11/10/2017Response to Motion filed Response to Motion for Leave to file Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
11/10/2017Call received Call received from petitioner's counsel to inform the Court that a response to the motion for leave to file post-submission brief is forthcoming.
11/10/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Sent email to petitioner's counsel to determine whether they are opposed, or unopposed, to respondent's motion for leave to file post-submission brief.
11/08/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of respondent Kleberg County.
11/08/2017Miscellaneous Motion Motion for Leave to file Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
10/12/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Duncan C. Norton and Jeffrey S. Reed; Argued on behalf of respondent by Brad Rockwell
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Duncan C. Norton and Jeffrey S. Reed with Lloyd Gosselink Rocheele & Townsend, P.C. of Austin, Texas, filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Brad Rockwell with Frederick, Perales, Allmon & Rockwell P.C. filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 12, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
06/12/2017Supplemental Letter Brief Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
05/12/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
04/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due May 12, 2017.
04/19/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
04/12/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
02/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due April 12, 2017; Reply Brief is due April 27, 2017.
02/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response Brief on Merits filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
02/21/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
02/02/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/23/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
01/20/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than February 21, 2017; Response brief due March 13, 2017; Reply brief due March 28, 2017.
12/02/2016Reply to Response Reply filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
10/27/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply is due December 2, 2016.
10/27/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
10/19/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
09/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Requested Response due October 19, 2016.
09/14/2016Electronic communication received from Party Received email from petitioner's counsel and he stated that URI does not oppose the extension and/or do not plan to file any response.  
09/14/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Contacted opposing counsel to inquire whether petitioner is opposed, or unopposed, to respondent's motion to extend time.
09/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kleberg County.
08/19/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than September 19, 2016.
07/19/2016Case forwarded to Court  
06/15/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of URI, Inc.
05/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedOpposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Uri, Inc. has been granted. Petition for Review is due June 15, 2016.
05/10/2016Electronic communication sent to Party E-mailed Mr. Rockwell, counsel for respondent, to determine if a response to opposed motion will be filed.
05/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Uri, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/09/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kleberg CountyRespondentMr. Eric Michael Allmon
Ms. Marisa Perales
Mr. Bradley L. Rockwell
Mr. Robert C. Hilliard
Mr. David Frederick
URI, Inc.PetitionerMr. J. A. (Tony) Canales
Mr. Jeptha P. Hill
Mr. Jeffrey S. Reed  
Mr. Duncan C. Norton
Ms. Jo Ellen Hewins
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 01-28-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Gregory Thomas Perkes 
Trial Court Information
105th District Court 
Kleberg 
Honorable Jack William Pulcher 
07-454-D  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site