Supreme Court

Case: 16-0301    
16-0301
04/29/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ONCOR ELECTRIC DELIVERY COMPANY LLC 
CHAPARRAL ENERGY, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/2018Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
02/12/2018Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of petitioner, Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
02/05/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
02/01/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amici Brief of Centerpoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC, AEP Texas Inc., and Texas-New Mexico Power Co. Submitted by Macey Reasoner Stokes of Baker Botts L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
10/20/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
09/21/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
07/31/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
04/17/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
03/08/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
10/21/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/27/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/27/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Justice Boyd delivered the opinion of the Court.
(4/27/2018 12:03:34 PM) 160301.pdf, 16-0301.jmt.pdf
03/01/2018Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
02/12/2018Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of petitioner, Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
02/07/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Robert K. Wise; Argued on behalf of respondent by Robert J. Witte
02/05/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
02/01/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amici Brief of Centerpoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC, AEP Texas Inc., and Texas-New Mexico Power Co. Submitted by Macey Reasoner Stokes of Baker Botts L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
01/23/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Robert J. Witte of Strasburger & Price, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
12/18/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Robert K. Wise with Lillard Wise Szygenda PLLC of Dallas,filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
12/15/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 7, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes.
12/08/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
12/08/2017Petition for Review granted  
10/20/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
10/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due October 20, 2017.
10/03/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Co., LLC.
09/21/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
08/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due September 21, 2017; Reply Brief is due October 6, 2017.
08/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
07/31/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
06/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Breif on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due August 2, 2017; Response Brief is due August 22, 2017; Reply Brief is due September 6, 2017.
06/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
06/16/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
06/05/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 8th COA
06/02/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than July 3, 2017; Response brief due July 24, 2017; Reply brief due August 8, 2017.
04/17/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
03/17/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply is due April 17, 2017.
03/17/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
03/08/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
02/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due March 8, 2017.
01/31/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chaparral Energy, LLC.
01/06/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 6, 2017.
11/22/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/21/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
10/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review, as reinstated, granted.  Petition for review due no later than November 14, 2016. The abatement order issued June 1, 2016 is lifted.
10/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to 53.7(f) reinstated  
10/14/2016Abatement Order Lifted Abatement order issued June 1, 2016 is lifted.
10/14/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion to Lift Abatement granted
10/03/2016Call received Call received from Mr. Wise regarding the motion to lift abatement.
09/08/2016Miscellaneous Motion Motion to Lift Abatement filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
06/01/2016Order of the Court IssuedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedEffective May 26, 2016, the case is abated pursuant toTex. R. App. P. 8.2 until further order of this Court and is removed from the Court's active docket, subject to reinstatement upon proper motion.  Tex. R. App. P. 8.3.  All motions and other documents pending or filed are abated subject to being reurged in the event the case is reinstated. Tex. R. App. P. 8.2, 8.3.  It is the parties' responsibility to immediately notify this Court once the automatic bankruptcy stay is lifted.
06/01/2016Notice of Bankruptcy Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Request for Abatement Pending the Bankruptcy Stay filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC.
05/31/2016Call received Call received to inform the Court that petitioner attorney, Bob Wise, has received a notice of bankruptcy on behalf of Chaparral Energeny, LLC.
04/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC has been granted. Petition for Review is due on June 1, 2016.
04/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/14/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas-New Mexico Power Co.Amicus CuriaeMs. Arigesta Joyce Banks
Ms. Macey Reasoner Stokes
Mr. James H. Barkley
Centerpoint Energy Houston Electric, LLCAmicus CuriaeMs. Arigesta Joyce Banks
Ms. Macey Reasoner Stokes
Mr. James H. Barkley
Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLCPetitionerMr. Daniel G. Altman
Mr. Robert K. Wise
Chaparral Energy, LLCRespondentMr. P. Michael Jung
Mr. Robert J. Witte
Mr. Tate L. Hemingson
AEP Texas Inc.Amicus CuriaeMs. Arigesta Joyce Banks
Ms. Macey Reasoner Stokes
Mr. James H. Barkley
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
511 SW3d 750, 01-13-16 
8th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Ann Crawford McClure 
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court 
Ward 
Honorable Bob Parks 
12-07-22860-CVW 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site