Supreme Court

Case: 16-0297    
16-0297
04/26/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
SCI TEXAS FUNERAL SERVICES, INC. 
CODY NELSON 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/01/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
04/07/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
02/16/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Home Services, Inc.
10/31/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
10/14/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
06/09/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/06/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Richard B. Phillips, Jr.; Argued on behalf of respondent by Kirk L. Pittard
11/09/2017Call received Call received from Richard Phillips, counsel for petitioner, regarding the correct name for the petitioner in this case. Per the Petition for Review Identity of Parties & Counsel, the correct name is SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc. The style has been updated accordingly.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument wil be presented by Richard B. Phillips, Jr. with Thompson & Knight LLP, of Dallas, Texas, filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Kirk L. Pittard with Kelly, Durham & Pittard, LLP of Dallas, Texas, filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 6, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/01/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
04/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on May 1, 2017.
04/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
04/07/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
03/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's Brief is due on April 7, 2017. Reply Brief is due on April 24, 2017.
03/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
02/16/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Home Services, Inc.
01/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's Brief is due on February 16, 2017. Response Brief is due on March 8, 2017. Reply Brief is due on March 23, 2017.
01/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
12/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due February 1, 2017; Response Brief is due February 21, 2017; Reply Brief is due March 8, 2017.
12/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
12/08/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/05/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 11th COA
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 2, 2017; Response brief due January 23, 2017; Reply brief due February 7, 2017.
10/31/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
10/14/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
09/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Response is due on October 14, 2016.
09/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
08/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due September 14, 2016.
08/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
08/15/2016Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance - Kirk Pittard and F. Leighton Durham, III are designated lead counsel for Respondent Cody Nelson.
07/15/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response request to petition for review due no later than August 15, 2016.
06/14/2016Case forwarded to Court  
06/13/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Cody Nelson.
06/09/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
05/27/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due June 9, 2016.
05/27/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
04/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due June 1, 2016.
04/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/06/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nelson, CodyRespondentMs. Dava Greenberg-Spindler
Ms. Morgan A. McPheeters
Mr. John R. Howie Jr.
Mr. Kirk L. Pittard
Mr. F. Leighton Durham III
Mr. Peter M. Kelly
SCI Texas Funeral Services, Inc.PetitionerMr. David C. Schulte  
Mr. Richard B. Phillips Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
484 SW3d 248, 01-29-16 
11th Court of Appeals 
Honorable John M. Bailey 
Trial Court Information
35th District Court 
Brown 
Honorable William Stephen Ellis 
CV-08-10347 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site