Supreme Court

Case: 16-0260    
16-0260
04/13/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
AC INTERESTS, L.P. FORMERLY AMERICAN COATINGS, L.P. 
TEXAS COMMISSION ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/2016Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P.
11/10/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
09/28/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P. formerly American Coatings, L.P.
07/08/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P.
07/01/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
04/13/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P. formerly American Coatings, L.P.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/11/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by C. William Smalling, J.D.; Argued on behalf of respondent by Heather Gebelin Hacker
09/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Texas Commission of Environmental Quality. Oral Argument will be presented by Heather Gebelin Hacker.
07/03/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by C. William Smalling, J.D., of Houston, Texas, filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P. formerly American Coatings, L.P.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 11, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
04/21/2017Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel of Heather Hacker filed on behalf of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
03/31/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/31/2017Petition for Review granted  
12/04/2016Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P.
11/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due December 6, 2016.
11/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P.
11/10/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
10/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response Brief is due November 14, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due November 29, 2016.
10/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
09/28/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P. formerly American Coatings, L.P.
09/08/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
07/08/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P.
07/01/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
06/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on July 1, 2016.
06/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environment Quality.
05/27/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due on June 27, 2016.
04/26/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/21/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
04/13/2016Call received Received call from counsel for petitioner.
04/13/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of AC Interests, L.P. formerly American Coatings, L.P.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/11/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Commission on Environmental QualityRespondentMs. Priscilla M. Hubenak
Mr. Anthony C. Grigsby
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. James E. Davis
Ms. Heather Gebelin Hacker
Mr. Brantley D. Starr
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Ms. Cynthia Woelk
AC Interests, L.P. formerly American Coatings, L.P.PetitionerMr. Claude William Smalling III
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
521 SW3d 58, 02-11-16 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Laura C. Higley 
Trial Court Information
345th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Stephen Yelenosky 
D-1-GN-14-005160 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site