Supreme Court

Case: 16-0256    
16-0256
04/11/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
RICHARD T. ARCHER, DAVID B. ARCHER, CAROL ARCHER BUGG, JOHN V. ARCHER, KAREN ARCHER BALL, AND SHERRI ARCHER 
T. MARK ANDERSON AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, AS CO-EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF TED ANDERSON 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
10/03/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerNotice of Additional Authorities issued after Petitioners filed their Briefs filed on behalf of petitioners, Richard T. Archer, et al.
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of John Schaefer, Jessica Schaefer, Hilary Kulik, Gretchen Thompson,
Ronald Schaefer, Jr., and Matthew Schaefer (Schaefer Heirs).
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Jo Ann Rivera.
12/20/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
12/20/2016Amended Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Amended Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderson, et al.
12/06/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderson, et al.
11/16/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
07/05/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
06/17/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderson, et al.
05/18/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/19/2017Motion for Leave to File Post Submission disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Leave to file Post-Submission Brief granted.
10/18/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
10/18/2017Motion for leave to file post submission brief Unopposed Motion for Leave to file Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Ricahrd T. Archer, et al.
10/11/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Laurie Ratliff; Argued on behalf of respondents by Scott R. Kidd
10/03/2017Additional citations received. Notice of Additional Authorities issued after Petitioners filed their Briefs filed on behalf of petitioners, Richard T. Archer, et al.
08/29/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of address of Laurie Ratliff and Frank N. Ikard, counsel for petitioners.
07/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Arugment Submission Form filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Laurie Ratliff of Ikard Golden Jones, P.C. of Austin, Texas.
07/03/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderon, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Scott R. Kidd of Austin, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 11, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/22/2017Letter Filed Letter regarding scheduling conflict submitted by Laurie Ratliff, counsel for petitioners.
06/16/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/16/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/30/2017Letter Filed Letter to advise the Court of the application of the recent decision in Supreme Court case 15-0403 to the pending petition in this case. On behalf of respondents, T. Mark Anderson, et al.
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of John Schaefer, Jessica Schaefer, Hilary Kulik, Gretchen Thompson,
Ronald Schaefer, Jr., and Matthew Schaefer (Schaefer Heirs).
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Brief of Jo Ann Rivera.
01/06/2017Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
12/20/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
12/20/2016Amended Brief filed Respondent's Amended Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderson, et al.
12/06/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderson, et al.
11/16/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
10/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is due November 16, 2016; Respondent's brief is due December 6, 2016; and Reply brief is due December 21, 2016.
10/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
09/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due November 2, 2016; Respondent's brief is due November 22, 2016; and Reply brief is due December 7, 2016.
09/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
09/22/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 3rd COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
07/05/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
06/22/2016Letter Filed Letter to notify the Court that a reply to the response is forthcoming filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer.
06/22/2016Call received Call received from petitioner attorney, Laurie Ratliff, letting the Court know a reply to the response is forthcoming.
06/21/2016Case forwarded to Court  
06/17/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of T. Mark Anderson, et al.
05/18/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer.
04/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due May 18, 2016.
04/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Richard T. Archer, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/11/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rivera, Jo AnnAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Anderson, ChristineRespondentMr. Scott V. Kidd
Mr. Scott R. Kidd
Ball, Karen ArcherPetitionerMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Mr. Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Archer, SherriPetitionerMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Mr. Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Archer, Richard T.PetitionerMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Mr. Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Archer, David B.PetitionerMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Mr. Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Anderson, T. MarkRespondentMr. Scott V. Kidd
Mr. Scott R. Kidd
John Schaefer, Jessica Schaefer, Hilary Kulik, Gretchen Thompson, Ronald Schaefer, Jr. and Matthew SchaeferAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Bugg, Carol ArcherPetitionerMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Mr. Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Archer, John V.PetitionerMr. Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Ms. Laurie E. Ratliff
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
490 SW3d 175, 03-02-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Scott K. Field 
Trial Court Information
345th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Orlinda L. Naranjo 
D-1-GN-07-002328 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site