Supreme Court

Case: 16-0244    
16-0244
04/04/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ALAMO HEIGHTS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT 
CATHERINE CLARK 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/18/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of petitioner, Alamo ISD.
09/15/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentPost Submission Brief filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
02/08/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Alamo Heights I.S.D.
01/09/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received from Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund.  Submitted by Jonathan G. Brush of Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P., Houston, Texas.
01/09/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Catherine Clark
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Alamo Heights I.S.D.
07/18/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Alamo Heights ISD.
06/22/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
04/12/2016Amended Petition for Review filedPetitionerAmended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Alamo Heights Independent School District.
04/04/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Alamo Heights I.S.D.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/15/2018Case Stored e-stored
05/17/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/06/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/06/2018Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Boyd delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Lehrmann joined.
04/06/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment.  Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Johnson, Justice Devine, and Justice Brown joined.  Justice Blacklock did not participate in the decision.
(4/6/2018 5:30:13 PM) 16-0244.jmt.pdf, 160244.pdf, 160244d.pdf
09/18/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of petitioner, Alamo ISD.
09/15/2017Post submission brief filed Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
09/13/2017Submission Schedule Submission Schedule for September 13, 2017.
09/13/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Robert A. Schulman; Argued on behalf of respondent by Brendan K. McBride
08/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form of respondent, Catherine Clark. Oral Argument will be presented by Brendan K. McBride of McBride Law Firm of San Antonio, Texas.
08/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Robert A. Schulman with Shculman, Lopez, Hoffer & Adelstein, LLP of San Antonio, Texas, filed on behalf of Alamo Heights ISD.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 13, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
04/21/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Counsel Brendan K. McBride written designation for leave to attend a family matter on the following dates: June 21 through June 27, 2017.
04/10/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Mr. Brendan K McBride will be on vacation May 24, 2017 - June 2, 2017.
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/10/2017Petition for Review granted  
02/08/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Alamo Heights I.S.D.
01/23/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due February 8, 2017.
01/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Alamo Heights Independent School District.
01/09/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received from Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund.  Submitted by Jonathan G. Brush of Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P., Houston, Texas.
01/09/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Catherine Clark
12/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Respondent's brief is due January 9, 2017; and Reply brief is due January 24, 2017.
12/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
11/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due December 22, 2016; and Reply brief is due January 6, 2017.
11/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Alamo Heights I.S.D.
09/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due November 2, 2016. Further requests for extension of time for this filing will be disfavored. Response Brief is due November 22, 2016. Reply Brief is due December 7, 2016.
09/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Alamo Heights Independent School District
09/14/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/13/2016Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of of Robert A. Schulman filed on behalf of Alamo Heights Independent School District. Mr. Schulman will be on vacation from November 3 - November 6, 2016.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
07/18/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Alamo Heights ISD.
06/30/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply is due July 18, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
06/30/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of Alamo Heights ISD.
06/22/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
06/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Requested Response is due June 23, 2016.
06/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
05/13/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than June 13, 2016.
04/12/2016Amended Petition for Review filed Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Alamo Heights Independent School District.
04/12/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/08/2016Response Waiver filed Response Wavier filed on behalf of Catherine Clark.
04/04/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Alamo Heights I.S.D.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/15/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alamo Heights Independent School DistrictPetitionerMr. Robert Allen Schulman
Mr. Bryan P. Dahlberg  
Texas Associaiton of School Boards Legal Assistance FundAmicus CuriaeMr. Jonathan G. Brush
Clark, CatherineRespondentMs. Tracie Gee Conner
Mr. Matthew R. Pearson
Mr. Brendan K. McBride
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 10-21-15 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rebeca C. Martinez 
Trial Court Information
285th District Court 
Bexar 
Honorable Karen H. Pozza 
2009-CI-19821 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site