Supreme Court

Case: 16-0164    
16-0164
03/07/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BARBARA BATY 
OLGA FUTRELL, CRNA, AND COMPLETE ANESTHESIA CARE, P.C. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/2018Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Olga Futrell and Complete Anesthesia Care, P.C.
12/20/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
06/27/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Joint Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
06/13/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
03/07/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review, filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/2018Case Stored e-stored
05/04/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/04/2018Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
03/06/2018Case forwarded to Court  
03/06/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Olga Futrell and Complete Anesthesia Care, P.C.
02/14/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due on March 6, 2018.
02/14/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
02/02/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
02/02/2018Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Johnson delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Brown joined.
02/02/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Guzman, Justice Boyd, and Justice Devine joined. Justice Blacklock did not participate in the decision.
(2/2/2018 5:44:08 PM) 160164d.pdf, 160164.pdf, 16-0164.jmt.pdf
10/11/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Grant D. Blaies; Argued on behalf of respondent by Michelle E. Robberson
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Barbara Baty. Oral Argument will be presented by Grant D. Blaies of Blaies & Hightower, LLP of Fort Worth, Texas.
08/23/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Complete Anesthesia Care, P.C. Oral Argument will be presented by Michelle E. Robberson of Cooper & Scully, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 11, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
03/31/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/31/2017Petition for Review granted  
12/20/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
12/05/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE CONSIDERED. Respondent's Brief is due on December 20, 2016. Reply Brief is due on January 4, 2017.
12/05/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
11/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondents' brief is due December 13, 2016; and Reply brief is due December 28, 2016.
11/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
09/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due on November 2, 2016. Respondent's Brief is due on November 22, 2016. Reply Brief is due on December 7, 2016.
09/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
09/07/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 10th COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
06/27/2016Reply to Response Reply to Joint Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
06/13/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
05/31/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Response is due June 13, 2016.
05/31/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
04/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due June 6, 2016.
04/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, et al.
04/15/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due on May 16, 2016.
03/15/2016Case forwarded to Court  
03/11/2016Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Lead Counsel filed on behalf of respondent, Complete Anesthesia Care, P.C.
03/11/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver, filed on behalf of Olga Futrell, CRNA and Complete Anesthesia Care, P.C.
03/07/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Barbara Baty.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/15/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Futrell, OlgaRespondentMr. Winston L. Borum
Baty, BarbarbaPetitionerMr. Wesley M. Hightower
Mr. Grant D. Blaies
Mr. Wesley Trevor Myers
Complete Anesthesia Care, P.C.RespondentMs. Michelle E. Robberson  
Brett David Timmons
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
543 SW3d 269, 11-19-15 
10th Court of Appeals 
Honorable W. Stacy Trotter  
Trial Court Information
40th District Court 
Ellis 
Honorable Bob Carroll 
85552 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site