Supreme Court

Case: 16-0134    
16-0134
02/24/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
ALLWAYS AUTO GROUP, LTD. D/B/A ATASCOSA CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM 
STEVEN WALTERS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/23/2017Petition Reinstated  
03/13/2017Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
01/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Automobile Dealers Association, Texas Independent Automobile Dealers Association, Texas Recreational Vehicle Association and Texas Motorcycle Dealers Association.
01/17/2017Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
09/29/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Automobile Dealers Association.
09/28/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
09/13/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
08/24/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
05/16/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd., et al.
04/29/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
03/30/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/29/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
09/29/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed, trial court judgment reinstatedPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and reinstates the trial court's judgment.  Per Curiam Opinion
(9/29/2017 4:45:48 PM) 160134.pdf, 16-0134.jmt.pdf
09/29/2017Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
09/29/2017Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
06/23/2017Petition Reinstated  
06/23/2017Previous Order of the Court withdrawn Denial of petition for review on December 16, 2016 is withdrawn.
06/23/2017Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
03/13/2017Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
02/24/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than March 13, 2017.
01/24/2017Case forwarded to Court  
01/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Automobile Dealers Association, Texas Independent Automobile Dealers Association, Texas Recreational Vehicle Association and Texas Motorcycle Dealers Association.
01/17/2017Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
12/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Rehearing is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due January 17, 2017.
12/29/2016Electronic communication received from Party Email received from respondent's counsel. Mr. Endsley stated that the motion is unopposed.
12/29/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to respondent's counsel to determine if respondent is opposed or unopposed to the motion for extension of time to file rehearing.
12/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
12/16/2016Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/29/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Automobile Dealers Association.
09/28/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
09/13/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
08/24/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
07/26/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
07/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due August 24, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Response Brief is due September 13, 2016. Reply Brief is due September 28, 2016.
07/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, ltd.
06/24/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
06/24/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than July 25, 2016; Response brief due August 15, 2016; Reply brief due August 30, 2016.
05/16/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd., et al.
05/03/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/29/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
03/30/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
02/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedOpposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd. has been granted. Petition for Review is due March 30, 2016.
02/26/2016Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review Response to Motion for Extension of Time filed on behalf of Steven Walters.
02/25/2016Electronic communication sent to Party E-mailed Mr. Endsley, counsel for respondent, to determine if motion is opposed. Mr. Endsley replied that the motion is opposed and a response will be filed.
02/24/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Allways Auto Group, Ltd.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/16/2017StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Automobile Dealers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Daron L. Janis
Mr. Thomas G. Yoxall
Mr. Robert T. Mowrey
Allways Auto Group, Ltd.PetitionerMs. Esther Cortez
Mr. Ronald E. Mendoza
Mr. Isaac Jaime Huron
Ms. Beth D. Bradley
Ms. Lori Joanne Murphy
Walters, StevenRespondentMr. Russell William Endsley
Mr. Thomas J. Henry
Mr. Matthew S. Hull
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
484 SW3d 219, 01-14-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Nelda V. Rodriguez 
Trial Court Information
36th District Court 
Live Oak 
Honorable Starr Boldrick Bauer 
L-13-0087-CV-A(1)  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site