Supreme Court

Case: 16-0107    
16-0107
02/15/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ALBERT G. HILL, JR. 
SHAMOUN & NORMAN, LLP 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/09/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
01/23/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shamoun & Norman, LLP.
12/02/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
08/02/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
07/18/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shamoun & Norman, LLP.
07/11/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief filed on behalf of Texans for Lawsuit Reform.
05/23/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Sean D. Jordan of Jackson Walker LLP of Austin, Texas.
05/16/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the State of Texas. Submitted by Scott A. Keller of Office of the Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
05/11/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/10/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by James C. Ho; Argued by respondent by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued by Amicus Curiae, The State of Texas, by Scott A. Keller (Justice Guzman not sitting)
09/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of Respondent, Shamoun & Norman, LLP. Oral Argument will be presented by Wallace B. Jefferson of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend of Austin, Texas.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by James C. Ho with Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP of Dallas, Texas, filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of Amicus Curiae, the State of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Scott A. Keller of the Office of the Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
08/25/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion of Amicus Curiae The State of Texas to Participate in Oral Argument granted.  Time allotted to argue:  15/20/5
08/02/2017Motion to Argue filed Unopposed Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 10, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/16/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/16/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/09/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
02/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due March 9, 2017.
01/31/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
01/23/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shamoun & Norman, LLP.
12/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response brief is due January 23, 2017; Reply brief is due February 7, 2017.
12/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Shamoun & Norman, LLP.
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
10/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Petitioner's brief is due December 2, 2016; Respondent's brief is due December 22, 2016; and Reply brief is due January 6, 2017.
10/12/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
09/15/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due November 2, 2016; Respondent's brief is due November 22, 2016; Reply brief is due December 7, 2016.
09/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
08/02/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
07/18/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shamoun & Norman, LLP.
07/11/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Brief filed on behalf of Texans for Lawsuit Reform.
06/17/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than July 18, 2016.
05/23/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of the Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Sean D. Jordan of Jackson Walker LLP of Austin, Texas.
05/17/2016Call received Caller notified Clerk's Office that Amicus Brief was not posted to docket.
05/17/2016Case forwarded to Court  
05/16/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of the State of Texas. Submitted by Scott A. Keller of Office of the Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
05/12/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Shamoun & Norman, LLP.
05/11/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
03/22/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due May 11, 2016.
03/21/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
02/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr. has been granted. Petition for Review is due on April 11, 2016.
02/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/10/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Shamoun & Norman, LLPRespondentMr. William D. Cobb Jr.
Ms. Jennifer Ruth Josephson
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Mr. Charles T. Frazier Jr.
Melanie Plowman
Mr. C. Gregory Shamoun
Mr. Jonathan J. Cunningham
Ms. Lindsey Katherine Wyrick
Mr. Daniel D. Tostrud
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
Hill, Junior, Albert G.PetitionerAndrew Patrick LeGrand Sr.
Mr. Broadus A. Spivey
Mr. William Richard (Rick) Thompson II
Mr. Michael Lawrence Raiff
Mr. Stewart H. Thomas
Mr. James C. Ho
Mr. Bradley G. Hubbard
Mr. Tom Moore Dees III
Mr. Joseph B. Morris  
The State of TexasAmicus CuriaeAtty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Ms. Beth E. Klusmann
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Texans for Lawsuit ReformAmicus CuriaeMr. E. Lee Parsley
Texas Public Policy FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. Sean D. Jordan
Mr. Robert Earl Henneke
Ms. Danica Lynn Milios
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
483 SW3d 767, 01-26-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable David L. Bridges 
Trial Court Information
160th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable James R. Jordan 
DC-10-14714-H 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site