Supreme Court

Case: 16-0100    
16-0100
02/11/2016
Third Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
MAVERICK COUNTY AND CITY OF EAGLE PASS 
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS; DOS REPUBLICAS COAL PARTNERSHIP; CAMINO REAL FUELS, LLC; AND NORTH AMERICAN COAL COMPANY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/30/2017Reply BriefEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County.
01/30/2017Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association, et al.
01/13/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.
01/13/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dos Republicas Coal Partnership.
12/08/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Revised Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County.
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association, et al.
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
07/07/2016Reply to ResponseEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County.
06/22/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Dos Republicas Coal Partnership, et al.
06/22/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
05/20/2016Petition for Review #3PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association and George Baxter.
04/20/2016Petition for Review #2PetitionerCross Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
03/14/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County, Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/21/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
04/21/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
04/21/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied 
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied 
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied 
01/31/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Respondent's Counsel Notice of Change of Address filed on behalf of Maverick County.
01/30/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County.
01/30/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association, et al.
01/13/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.
01/13/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Dos Republicas Coal Partnership.
12/08/2016Brief on the Merits Revised Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
12/05/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedAgreed Motion to Revise the City of Eagle Pass’s Brief on the Merits and Enter New Briefing Schedule is granted.
12/05/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing dismissed as mootJoint Motion to Revise or Return the City of Eagle Pass’s Brief on the Merits filed on November 17, 2016 is dismissed as moot.
12/01/2016Miscellaneous Motion Agreed Motion to Revise the City of Eagle Pass’s Brief on the Merits and Enter New Briefing Schedule.
11/21/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to Joint Motion to Revise or Return the City of Eagle Pass's Brief on the Merits due no later than December 1, 2016.
11/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief granted.  Respondents' brief due no later than December 22, 2016; Reply brief due January 6, 2017.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of respondents, Dos Republicas Coal Partnership, Camino Real Fuels, LLC, and The North American Coal Corp. and the Railroad Commission of Texas.
11/17/2016Miscellaneous Motion Joint Motion to Revise or Return the City of Eagle Pass’s Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of respondents, Dos Republicas Coal Partnership, Camino Real Fuels, LLC, and The North American Coal Corp. and the Railroad Commission of Texas.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association, et al.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Maverick County.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
09/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioners' Brief is due on November 2, 2016. Respondents' Brief is due on November 22, 2016. Reply Brief is due on December 7, 2016.
09/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
09/07/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 3rd COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
07/07/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County.
06/22/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Dos Republicas Coal Partnership, et al.
06/22/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
05/24/2016Case forwarded to Court  
05/20/2016Petition for Review #3 Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County Environmental and Public Health Association and George Baxter.
05/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County, Texas, et al. and Railroad Commission of Texas, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due June 22, 2016.
05/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County, Texas, et al. and Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.
05/02/2016Call received Call received from Railroad Commission of Texas - disregard the Response Waiver, a Response will be filed.
05/02/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
04/29/2016Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Leave to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel is granted.
04/29/2016Motion to Withdraw Filed Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel for Maverick County Hospital District.
04/26/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/22/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested responses to both petitions for review due no later than May 23, 2016.
04/20/2016Petition for Review #2 Cross Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
04/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Cross Petition for Review is granted. Eagle Pass' Petition for Review is due April 20, 2016.
04/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review #2 filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Eagle Pass.
03/22/2016Case forwarded to Court  
03/21/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of the Railroad Commission of Texas.
03/18/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Dos Republicas Coal Partnership, Camino Real Fuels, LLC and North American Coal Company.
03/14/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County, Texas.
02/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due March 14, 2016.
02/15/2016Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel, filed on behalf of Dos Republicas Coal Partnership.
02/12/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to verify contact information for respondent attorneys: William Cobb and Chesley Blevins.  Need state bar number for Mr. Cobb.
02/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Maverick County, Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/21/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North American Coal CompanyRespondentMr. Dudley D. McCalla
Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III
Mr. Leonard H. Dougal
Ms. Jenny Lee Smith
Railroad Commission of TexasRespondentMs. Priscilla M. Hubenak
Mr. Brantley D. Starr
Mr. Daniel C. Wiseman
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. James E. Davis
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Ms. Nancy Elizabeth Olinger
Ms. Cynthia Woelk
Camino Real Fuels, LLCRespondentMr. Chesley N. Blevins
Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III
Mr. Leonard H. Dougal
Ms. Jenny Lee Smith
Mr. Dudley D. McCalla
Maverick County Environmental and Public Health AssociationOther interested party Mr. Paul Robert Tough
Mr. Adam Friedman
Mr. Thomas M. Weber
Mr. Enrique Valdivia
Mr. Javier Riojas
Baxter, GeorgeOther interested party Mr. Javier Riojas
Mr. Thomas M. Weber
Mr. Adam Friedman
Mr. Paul Robert Tough
Mr. Enrique Valdivia
Maverick County, TexasPetitioner 1Mr. David Frederick
Maverick County Hospital DistrictOther interested party Mr. Alexis J. Fuller Jr.
City of Eagle PassPetitioner 2Mr. Heriberto Morales Jr.
Mr. Stephen J. Ahl
Dos Republicas Coal PartnershipRespondentMr. Leonard H. Dougal
Mr. Chesley N. Blevins
Mr. Dudley D. McCalla
Ms. Mallory Ann Beck
Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III
Ms. Jenny Lee Smith
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 12-29-15 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Melissa Young Goodwin 
Trial Court Information
261st District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Darlene Byrne 
D-1-GV-13-000416 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site