Supreme Court

Case: 16-0098    
16-0098
02/10/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE DALLAS MORNING NEWS, INC. AND STEVE BLOW 
JOHN TATUM AND MARY ANN TATUM 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked vesion of Respondents' Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of John Tatum.
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked version of Respondets' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of John Tatum.
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked version of Respondents' Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of John Tatum.
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked version of Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
08/02/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, et al.
06/28/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Brief of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
06/15/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
06/06/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press submitted by Russell Falconer of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP of Dallas, TX, and Eugene Volokh of Scott & Cyan Banister First, Amendment Clinic, UCLA School of Law of Los Angeles, CA.
04/12/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
01/20/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc.
09/20/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Press Association, Texas Association of Broadcasters and The Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by James A. Hemphill of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC of Austin, Texas.
08/18/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
08/03/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of John Tatum and Mary Ann Tatum.
04/12/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/27/2017Submission resetCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been reset for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 10, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  15/20/5 minutes
10/20/2017Motion to Argue disposedFiling grantedPetitioner's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Share Argument Time with Amicus Curiae granted.  Time allotted to argue:  15/20/5 minutes
10/04/2017Miscellaneous Motion Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Share Argument Time with Amicus Curiae filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 9, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked vesion of Respondents' Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of John Tatum.
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of Respondets' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of John Tatum.
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of Respondents' Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of John Tatum.
08/11/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
08/02/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, et al.
07/24/2017Reply to Response to Motion Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
07/13/2017Response to Motion filed Petitioners' Response to Respondents' Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. and Steve Blow.
06/29/2017Miscellaneous Motion Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
06/28/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Brief of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
06/20/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to file Response to Amicus Brief is granted.
06/16/2017Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion to file Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
06/15/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
06/07/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedResident Attorney, Russell H. Falconer's Motion in Support of Eugene Volokh's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted.
06/07/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedNon Resident Attorney Eugene Volokh's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice granted.
06/06/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press submitted by Russell Falconer of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP of Dallas, TX, and Eugene Volokh of Scott & Cyan Banister First, Amendment Clinic, UCLA School of Law of Los Angeles, CA.
06/06/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted counsel Russell Falconer regarding the motions pro hac vice.
06/06/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Resident Attorney, Russell H. Falconer's Motion in Support of Eugene Volokh's Motion Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press.
06/06/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Non Resident Attorney Eugene Volokh's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press.
05/25/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Reply Brief is due on June 16, 2017.
05/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
04/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on May 26, 2017.
04/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
04/12/2017Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
03/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Response brief is due April 12, 2017; Reply brief is due April 27, 2017.
03/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
02/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on March 13, 2017. Reply Brief is due on March 28, 2017.
02/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
01/20/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc.
12/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will not be considered. Petitioners' brief is due January 20, 2017; Respondents' brief is due February 9, 2017; and Reply brief is due February 24, 2017.
12/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
11/02/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioners' brief is due December 21, 2016; Respondents' brief is due January 10, 2017; and Reply brief is due January 25, 2017.
10/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
10/24/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
10/21/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than November 21, 2016; Response brief due December 12, 2016; Reply brief due December 27, 2016.
09/20/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Press Association, Texas Association of Broadcasters and The Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by James A. Hemphill of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody PC of Austin, Texas.
08/18/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
08/03/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of John Tatum and Mary Ann Tatum.
07/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Response is due August 3, 2016.
07/25/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
05/31/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due July 27, 2016.
05/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of John Tatum, et al.
05/27/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due on June 27, 2016.
04/26/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/22/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of John and Mary Ann Tatum.
04/12/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc., et al.
03/14/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due April 14, 2016.  Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
03/09/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, and Steve Blow.
02/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. and Steve Blow has been granted. Petition for Review is due on March 17, 2016.
02/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. and Steve Blow.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/10/2018Submission (Set to be Heard)Submission (Set to be heard)(Time allotted to argue: 15/20/5 minutes)
06/29/2017Motion being reviewed by CourtMiscellaneous MotionMotion for Sanctions
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Blow, StevePetitionerMs. Rachel A. Ekery  
Mr. Paul C. Watler
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Ms. Shannon Z. Teicher
Tatum, JohnRespondentMr. Joseph D. Sibley IV
Texas Press AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. James Alan Hemphill
Texas Association of BroadcastersAmicus CuriaeMr. James Alan Hemphill
The Freedom of Information Foundation of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. James Alan Hemphill
The Dallas Morning News, Inc.PetitionerMs. Shannon Z. Teicher
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Ms. Rachel A. Ekery  
Mr. Paul C. Watler
Tatum, Mary AnnRespondentMr. Joseph D. Sibley IV
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the PressAmicus CuriaeMr. Russell Falconer
Mr. Eugene Volokh
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
493 SW3d 646, 12-30-15 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable William G. Whitehill 
Trial Court Information
68th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Martin J. Hoffman 
DC-11-07371 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site