Supreme Court

Case: 15-0944    
15-0944
12/10/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS 
C.W.H. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/21/2016Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
09/06/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of C.W.H., Jr.
08/17/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
04/26/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
04/11/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of C.W.H., Jr.
02/12/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
10/20/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
10/20/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed/remanded to trial courtThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Boyd delivered the opinion of the Court.
(10/20/2017 5:55:08 PM) 150944.pdf, 15-0944.jmt.pdf
09/12/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Matthew H. Frederick; Argued on behalf of respondent by Noel D. Cooper
09/01/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, the Office of the Attorney General of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Matthew H. Frederick of Austin, Texas.
08/31/2017Letter Filed Letter to advise the Court of an amendment to the chapter of the Texas Family Code filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
08/02/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, C.W.H. Oral Argument will be presented by Noel D. Cooper of Nacogdoches, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 12, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/10/2017Petition for Review granted  
09/21/2016Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
09/06/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of C.W.H., Jr.
08/17/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
07/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due August 17, 2016; Respondent's brief is due September 6, 2016; and Reply brief is due September 21, 2016.
07/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General.
06/29/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
06/21/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 12th COA
06/17/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than July 18, 2016; Response brief due August 8, 2016; Reply brief due August 23, 2016.
04/26/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
04/12/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/11/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of C.W.H., Jr.
03/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of C.W.H., Jr., has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on April 13, 2016.
03/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of C.W.H., Jr.
02/12/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
01/12/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General of Texas has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due February 12, 2016.
01/12/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
12/11/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of the Office of the Attorney General, has been granted. Petition for Review is due January 13, 2016.
12/11/2015Letter Filed Letter regarding fees exemption filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
12/10/2015Notice requesting filing fee Fee Request sent to Petitioner.
12/10/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Emailed counsel for respondent to determine if motion was opposed.
12/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/30/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B., S.Other interested party Mr. Jeremy S. Willis
H., Junior, C. W.RespondentMs. Elizabeth R. Brice
Mr. Noel D. Cooper  
B., L.Other interested party Mr. Jeremy S. Willis
The Office of the Attorney General of TexasPetitionerMr. Matthew H. Frederick
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Ms. Rande K. Herrell
Mr. Charles E. Roy
Mr. Ildefonso Ochoa Jr.
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Ms. Cora L. Meyer
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. John B. Worley
Mr. Deterrean S. Gamble
Ms. Mara Flanagan Friesen
S., J. A.Other interested party Ms. Susan Denton Ward
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 09-16-15 
12th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Brian Hoyle 
Trial Court Information
145th District Court 
Nacogdoches 
Honorable Campbell Cox 
C0824736 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site