Supreme Court

Case: 15-0935    
15-0935
12/07/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
XOG OPERATING, LLC AND GERONIMO HOLDING CORPORATION 
CHESAPEAKE EXPLORATION LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AND CHESAPEAKE EXPLORATION, L.L.C. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/2018Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
03/22/2018Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Texas Oil and Gas Association. Submitted by Cory Pomeroy of Austin, Texas.
02/12/2018Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Ltd. P'ship, et al.
01/31/2018Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Brief filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
01/08/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC and Geronimo Holding Corporation.
01/05/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Pennington Resources, LLC, et al. Submitted by Brandon E. Durrett and Melanie L. Fry of Dykema Cox Smith of San Antonio, Texas.
01/04/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Browning Oil Company submitted by Michael E. McElroy and Pamela Stanton Baron of Austin, Texas.
09/01/2017Petition Reinstated  
08/09/2017Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Ltd. P'ship, et al.
05/17/2017Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
02/06/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
12/22/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership and Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C.
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
06/16/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
06/01/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership, et al.
01/19/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review, filed on behalf of XXOG Operating, LLC, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/29/2018Case Stored e-stored
09/28/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
09/28/2018Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
05/30/2018Case forwarded to Court  
05/30/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
04/20/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due May 30, 2018.
04/20/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
04/13/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/13/2018Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment.  Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court.  
(4/13/2018 3:19:20 PM) 150935.pdf, 15-0935.jmt.pdf
03/22/2018Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Texas Oil and Gas Association. Submitted by Cory Pomeroy of Austin, Texas.
02/12/2018Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Ltd. P'ship, et al.
01/31/2018Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
01/09/2018Submission Schedule  
01/09/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by John R. Hays, Jr.; Argued on behalf of respondents by Ryan Clinton
01/08/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC and Geronimo Holding Corporation.
01/08/2018Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation for attorneys for XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
01/05/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Pennington Resources, LLC, et al. Submitted by Brandon E. Durrett and Melanie L. Fry of Dykema Cox Smith of San Antonio, Texas.
01/04/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Browning Oil Company submitted by Michael E. McElroy and Pamela Stanton Baron of Austin, Texas.
12/13/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address for Attorneys John R. Hays, Jr. and Alicia R. French filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
12/13/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioners, XOG Operating, LLC, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by John R. Hays, Jr. of Hays & Owens L.L.P. of Austin Texas.
11/27/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of respondents, Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership and Chesapeake Exploration, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Ryan Clinton of Davis, Gerald & Cremer of Austin, Texas.
10/27/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 9, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
10/27/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
10/27/2017Petition for Review granted  
10/27/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing dismissed as mootPetitioners' Motion for Oral Argument dismissed as moot
09/15/2017Miscellaneous Motion Opposed Motion for Oral Argument filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
09/01/2017Petition Reinstated  
09/01/2017Previous Order of the Court withdrawn Denial of petition for review on March 31, 2017 is withdrawn.
09/01/2017Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
08/09/2017Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Ltd. P'ship, et al.
07/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on August 9, 2017.
07/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Rehearing filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership.
06/23/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than July 10, 2017.
05/23/2017Case forwarded to Court  
05/17/2017Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
04/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due May 17, 2017.
04/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
03/31/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied 
02/06/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
12/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due February 6, 2017.
12/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
12/22/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership and Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response Brief on the Merits is due December 22, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due January 6, 2016.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unoppsed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership and Chesapeake Exploration,
L.L.C.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
09/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due November 2, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Response Brief is due November 22, 2016. Reply Brief is due December 7, 2016.
09/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of XOG Operating.
09/14/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 7th COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
06/16/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
06/01/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership, et al.
04/27/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due June 1, 2016.
04/27/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership, et al.
04/01/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than May 2, 2016.
02/23/2016Case forwarded to Court  
02/18/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership.
01/19/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review, filed on behalf of XXOG Operating, LLC, et al.
12/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due January 20, 2016.
12/07/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of XOG Operating, LLC, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/29/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tyner Energy, LPAmicus CuriaeMs. Melanie L. Fry
Mr. Brandon Durrett
Texas Oil and Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Cory Pomeroy  
Browning Oil Company, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Michael E. McElroy
Ms. Pamela Stanton Baron
Geronimo Holding CorporationPetitionerMr. John R. Hays Jr.
Ms. Alicia Ringuet French
Ms. Vanessa G. Buzzard
Mr. Michael T. Morgan
Redwood Exploration Company, LLCAmicus CuriaeMr. Brandon Durrett
Ms. Melanie L. Fry
Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C.RespondentMr. Jacob M. Davidson
Mr. John A. "Jad" Davis Jr.
Mr. Dusty Joe Stockard  
Mr. Ryan D. Clinton  
Chesapeake Exploration Limited PartnershipRespondentMr. Dusty Joe Stockard  
Mr. Ryan D. Clinton  
Mr. John A. "Jad" Davis Jr.
Mr. Jacob M. Davidson
XOG Operation, LLCPetitionerMs. Vanessa G. Buzzard
Ms. Alicia Ringuet French
Mr. J. Bruce Bennett
Mr. Michael T. Morgan
Mr. John R. Hays Jr.
Pennington Resources, LLCAmicus CuriaeMs. Melanie L. Fry
Mr. Brandon Durrett
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
480 SW3d 22, 09-02-15 
7th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Patrick A. Pirtle 
Trial Court Information
31st District Court 
Wheeler 
Honorable Steven Ray Emmert 
12,375 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site