Supreme Court

Case: 15-0932    
15-0932
12/07/2015
Second Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
AMERICAN K-9 DETECTION SERVICES, LLC AND HILL COUNTRY DOG CENTER, LLC 
LATASHA FREEMAN 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.
03/09/2017Reply BriefEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
01/23/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merit filed on behalf of Latasha Freeman.
01/06/2017Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply Brief filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
12/02/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
11/22/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merit filed on behalf of Latasha Freeman.
11/02/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
08/08/2016Surreply filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Sur-Reply to Latasha Freeman's Sur-Response filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
08/05/2016Surreply filedRespondentSur-Reply to Hill County Dong Center's Reply filed on behalf of respondent, LaTasha Freeman.
08/05/2016Reply to ResponseEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
08/03/2016Reply to ResponseEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply to Petition filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
06/30/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of LaTasha Freeman.
02/11/2016Petition for Review #2PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
02/08/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner, American K-9 Detention Services, LLC, by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued on behalf of petitioner, Hill County Dog Center, LLC, by Deborah McClure; Argued on behalf of respondent by Chad Flores
12/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner, American K-9 Detention Services, LLC, by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued on behalf of petitioner, Hill County Dog Center, LLC, by Deborah McClure; Argued on behalf of respondent by Chad Flores
12/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.
11/30/2017Letter Filed Letter regarding division of oral argument participation time filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
11/29/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Returned call to Deborah McClure regarding filing a motion to allow additional counsel to sit at counsel table.  Ms. McClure will be submitting a motion no later than December 1, 2017.
11/14/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, American K-9 Detection Services, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Wallace B. Jefferson of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP.
11/13/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Hill Country Dog Center, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Deborah McClure of the firm W. Calloway Huffaker, Attorney at Law of Amarillo, Texas.
11/08/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Designation of Lead Counsel of Chad Flores and David M. Gunn filed on behalf of LaTasha Freeman.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, LaTasha Freeman. Oral Argument will be presented by Chad Flores of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
03/09/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
02/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedAmerican K-9's Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on March 9, 2017.
02/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.
01/23/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merit filed on behalf of Latasha Freeman.
01/06/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
12/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on January 23, 2017. Reply Brief is due on February 7, 2017.
12/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits to American K-9's brief filed on behalf of Latasha Freeman.
12/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on January 6, 2016.
12/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
11/22/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merit filed on behalf of Latasha Freeman.
11/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
10/31/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detections Servies, LLC has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED.Petitioner's Brief is due on December 2, 2016. Response Brief is due on December 22, 2015. Reply Brief is due on January 6, 2016.
10/31/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
09/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief of Hill Country Dog Center is due November 2, 2016.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due November 22, 2016. Reply Brief is due December 7, 2016.
09/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
09/23/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due November 2, 2016; Respondent's brief is due November 22, 2016; Reply brief is due Decemer 7, 2016.
09/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.
09/12/2016Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of counsel Deborah S. McClure filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC. She will be on vacation from Sept. 19  through Sept. 30, 2016.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016
08/08/2016Surreply filed Sur-Reply to Latasha Freeman's Sur-Response filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
08/05/2016Surreply filed Sur-Reply to Hill County Dong Center's Reply filed on behalf of respondent, LaTasha Freeman.
08/05/2016Reply to Response Reply filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
08/03/2016Reply to Response Reply to Petition filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
07/14/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due August 5, 2016.
07/14/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
07/13/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due August 5, 2016.
07/13/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Service, LLC.
06/30/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of LaTasha Freeman.
05/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses to Petitions for Review is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Response is due July 1, 2016.
05/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses to Petitions for Review filed on behalf of Latasha Freeman.
04/27/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of LaTasha Freeman has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due June 1, 2016.
04/27/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of LaTasha Freeman.
04/26/2016Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent to parties to clarify the Court requests responses to both petitions for review from the respondent.
04/01/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested responses to petitions for review due no later than May 2, 2016.
02/23/2016Case forwarded to Court  
02/23/2016Case forwarded to Court  
02/17/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver to the Petitions for Review filed on behalf of LaTasha Freeman.
02/11/2016Petition for Review #2 Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
02/08/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.
01/12/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Hill Country Dog Center's Petition for Review is due February 12, 2016.
01/12/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
01/04/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. American K9 Detection Services' Petition for Review is due February 8, 2016.
01/04/2016Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
12/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC. has been granted. Petition for Review is due January 13, 2016.
12/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review #2 filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hill Country Dog Center, LLC.
12/07/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due January 13, 2015.
12/07/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of American K-9 Detection Services, LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/07/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Freeman, LaTashaRespondentMr. Javier Herrera
Ms. Beth E. Watkins
Mr. Bryan D. Pope
Ms. Shannon K. Dunn  
Mr. Amos Louis Barton
Ms. Mary Alice McLarty
Mr. Charles 'Chad' R. Flores
Mr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Frank Herrera Jr.
American K-9 Detection Services, L.L.C.Petitioner 1Ms. Amy Warr
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Ms. Rachel A. Ekery  
Mr. James M. Parker Jr.
Hill Country Dog Center, L.L.C.Petitioner 2Mr. Albert D. Pattillo
Ms. Deborah Smith McClure
Mr. Wayne Calloway Huffaker Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
494 SW3d 393, 10-29-15 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Dori Contreras 
Trial Court Information
198th District Court 
Bandera 
Honorable Melvin Rex Emerson 
CV-13-246 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site