Supreme Court

Case: 15-0905    
15-0905
11/23/2015
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE STATE FARM LLOYDS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/21/2017Post submission brief filedRelatorResponse to Real Parties' Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
04/12/2017Post submission brief filedReal Parties in Interest Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
11/14/2016Amended Brief filedAmicus Curiae Amended Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
11/14/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
10/26/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Lawyers for Civil Justice in support of Mandamus. Submitted by Richard B. Phillips, Jr. of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
10/06/2016Reply BriefRelatorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
09/21/2016Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
07/01/2016Brief on the MeritsRelatorBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
02/16/2016Reply to ResponseRelatorReply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
02/08/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
12/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the Texas Association of Defense Counsel, in support of State Farm Lloyds. Submitted by Robert L. Florance, IV of Orgain Bell & Tucker, LLP.
12/17/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Lawyers for Civil Justice. Submitted by Richard B. Phillips, Jr., John H. Martin and John P. Atkins of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
12/15/2015Amended Brief filedAmicus Curiae Amended Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. in support of support of State Farm Lloyds. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP of Houston, Texas.
12/14/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. in support of support of State Farm Lloyds. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP of Houston, Texas.
12/11/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter, filed on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by George Christian, of the Texas Civil Justice League.
11/23/2015Appendix FiledRelatorAppendix to Petition for Writ of Manadamus filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
11/23/2015Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/2017Case Stored e-stored
07/07/2017Certified cys of cost bill sent to attys of record Cost Bill Issued
05/26/2017Opinion issuedDeniedThe Court denies the petition for writ of mandamus.  Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/26/2017 3:54:32 PM) 150903.pdf
05/26/2017Stay Order lifted Stay order issued January 8, 2016 is lifted.
04/21/2017Post submission brief filed Response to Real Parties' Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
04/12/2017Post submission brief filed Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
03/09/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of relator by Jonathan M. Redgrave; Argued on behalf of real parties in interest by Jennifer Bruch Hogan
03/02/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedResident Attorney, Brian M. Chandler's Motion in Support of Bulander's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
03/02/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedNon Resident Attorney, Mathea K.E. Bulander's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Resident Attorney, Brian M. Chandler's Motion in Support of Bulander's Motion Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Non Resident Attorney, Mathea K.E. Bulander's Motion Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Relator State Farm Lloyds.
02/13/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs. Oral Argument will be presented by Jennifer Bruch Hogan of Hogan & Hogan of Houston, Texas.
02/09/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds. Oral Argument will be presented by Jonathan M. Redgrave of Redgrave  LLP.
01/20/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentConsolidated for oral argument only with 15-0903.  This cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 9, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/20/2017Mandamus Set to Argue  
01/20/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedCase set for oral argument 
11/14/2016Amended Brief filed Amended Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
11/14/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P. of Houston, Texas.
10/26/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Lawyers for Civil Justice in support of Mandamus. Submitted by Richard B. Phillips, Jr. of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
10/06/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
09/21/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
09/16/2016Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel granted
09/07/2016Motion to Withdraw Filed Unopposed Motion to Withdraw filed on behalf of Mollie C. Nichols, attorney for State Farm Lloyds.
08/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Response Brief is due on September 21, 2016. Reply Brief is due on October 6, 2016.
08/15/2016Response to Motion filed Response to Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
08/12/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Emailed counsel for relator to determine if a response would be filed.
08/12/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Opposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Part in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
08/12/2016Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Jennifer Hogan as Lead Appellate Counsel for Real Party in Interest MDL Plaintiffs.
07/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response Brief is due August 22, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply is due September 6, 2016.
07/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
07/01/2016Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
06/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to File Relator's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Rel's Brief is due July 1, 2016, Response Brief is due July 21, 2016; Reply Brief is due August 5, 2016.
06/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
05/27/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested:  Relator's brief due no later than June 27, 2016, Response brief due July 18, 2016, Reply brief due August 2, 2016.
02/16/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
02/16/2016Case forwarded to Court  
02/10/2016Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds. Relator will file a Reply on or before February 22, 2016.
02/08/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of MDL Plaintiffs.
01/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Response is due February 8, 2016.  Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
01/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Alejos Ramirez and Ofelia Ramirez.
01/20/2016Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedResident Motion in Support of Johnathan Redgrave's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission has been granted.
01/20/2016Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedNonresident Attorney Jonathan M. Redgrave's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission has been granted.
01/19/2016Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Jonathan M. Redgrave's Verified Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
01/19/2016Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Redgrave filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
01/08/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than January 25, 2016.
01/08/2016Stay Order issued  
01/08/2016Motion to Stay DisposedFiling grantedRelator's Motion for Stay granted as amended
12/23/2015Amendment to Motion filed  Relator’s AMENDED Motion for Stay Pending Mandamus. On behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
12/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of the Texas Association of Defense Counsel, in support of State Farm Lloyds. Submitted by Robert L. Florance, IV of Orgain Bell & Tucker, LLP.
12/17/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedResident Motion in Support of Oot's Motion Pro Hac Vice has been granted.
12/17/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedNonresident Attorney Patrick Oot’s Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission has been granted.
12/17/2015Call received received phone call from Mr. Mostyn law office to inform the Court that they don't have any objections for the non-resident attorney's motion pro hac vice.
12/17/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Lawyers for Civil Justice. Submitted by Richard B. Phillips, Jr., John H. Martin and John P. Atkins of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
12/16/2015Phone call from Clerk's Office called real party's counsel to inquire whether they are opposed or not to amicus party's motions pro hac vice.
12/15/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Resident Motion in Support of Oot's Motion Pro Hac Vice. On behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
12/15/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Nonresident Attorney Patrick Oot’s Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission. On behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
12/15/2015Phone call from Clerk's Office called Mr. Lim, counsel for Amicus Chamber of Commerce, to inquire about the motions pro hac vice of out-state counsel, Mr. Oot. Left message and requested to resubmit the motions in this case and related case,15-0903.
12/15/2015Amended Brief filed Amended Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. in support of support of State Farm Lloyds. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP of Houston, Texas.
12/15/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Mr. Lim.  Provided application for refund of filing fee.
12/14/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. in support of support of State Farm Lloyds. Submitted by Daniel Lim of Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP of Houston, Texas.
12/11/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter, filed on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by George Christian, of the Texas Civil Justice League.
11/23/2015Motion to Stay Filed  Motion to Stay filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
11/23/2015Appendix Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ of Manadamus filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
11/23/2015Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of State Farm Lloyds.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/24/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
07/24/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chamber of Commerice of the United States of AmericaAmicus CuriaeMr. Daniel Lim
Mr. Patrick Oot
State Farm LloydsRelatorMr. Jonathan M. Redgrave
Ms. Mathea K.E. Bulander
Mr. Brian M. Chandler
David R. Stephens
Texas Association of BusinessAmicus CuriaeMr. Daniel Lim
Mr. Patrick Oot
Texas Civil Justice LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
MDL PlaintiffsReal Party in Interest Ms. Jennifer Bruch Hogan
Mr. Richard P. Hogan Jr.
Mr. John Steven Mostyn
Mr. James C. Marrow
Ms. Rene Michelle Sigman
Ms. Amber Lynn Anderson
National Association of Mutual Insurance CompaniesAmicus CuriaeMr. Daniel Lim
Mr. Patrick Oot
Texas Association of Defense CounselAmicus CuriaeMr. Robert L. Florance IV
Lawyers for Civil JusticeAmicus CuriaeMr. John H. Martin
Mr. Richard B. Phillips Jr.
Mr. John Atkins
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
518 SW3d 57, 10-28-15 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
206th District Court 
Hidalgo 
Honorable Rose Guerra Reyna 
14-0169 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site