Supreme Court

Case: 15-0819    
15-0819
10/22/2015
Second Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
HORIZON HEALTH CORPORATION 
ACADIA HEALTHCARE COMPANY, INC.; PSYCHIATRIC RESOURCE PARTNERS, INC.; MICHAEL A. SAUL; TIMOTHY J. PALUS; PETER D. ULASEWICZ; BARBARA H. BAYMA; AND JOHN M. PIECHOCKI 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/2017Post submission brief filedEvent related to first petition filed in case.Post-Submission Leter Brief filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp.
12/13/2016Corrected BriefPetitionerCorrected Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
12/12/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
12/12/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Co., Inc., et al.
10/28/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp.
10/28/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
09/08/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Healthcare Corporation.
09/08/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
05/31/2016Reply to ResponseEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply in support of Cross Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, et al.
05/16/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
05/11/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
04/22/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Jeff D. Balcombe.
01/04/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
01/04/2016Petition for Review #2Event related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/2017Case Stored e-stored
07/07/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/26/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/26/2017Opinion issuedIssued 
05/26/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirm and reverse in part; remand to court of appealsThe Court affirms in part and reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court. Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/26/2017 3:48:05 PM) 150819.pdf, 15-0819.jmt.pdf
03/15/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Leter Brief filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp.
03/01/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners/cross-respondents by Kendyl T. Hanks; Argued on behalf of respondents/cross-petitioners by Jeff Nobles
03/01/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners/cross-respondents by Kendyl T. Hanks; Argued on behalf of respondents/cross-petitioners by Jeff Nobles
02/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Kendyl T. Hanks with Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P. of Austin, Texas, filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
02/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Jeff Nobles with Deans & Lyons, LLP of Houston, Texas, filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Co., Inc., et al.
01/20/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 1, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/20/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 1, 2017.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
01/20/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/20/2017Petition for Review granted  
01/20/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/20/2017Petition for Review granted  
12/13/2016Corrected Brief Corrected Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
12/12/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
12/12/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Co., Inc., et al.
12/02/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will not be considered. Reply briefs are due December 12, 2016.
12/02/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation and Acadia Healthcare Company, et al.
12/02/2016Call received Petitioner will be filing a joint motion for extension of time to file reply brief on the merits requesting a one-week extension.
11/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedJoint Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply briefs are due December 5, 2016.
11/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp. and Acadia Healthcare Co., Inc., et al.
10/28/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp.
10/28/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
09/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedJOINT Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on October 28, 2016. Reply Brief is due on November 14, 2016.
09/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed JOINT Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
09/08/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Healthcare Corporation.
09/08/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
08/24/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedJOINT Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Briefs on the Merits is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's brief is due September 8, 2016; Respondents' brief is due September 28, 2016; Reply brief is due October 13, 2016.
08/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed JOINT Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of petitioner, Horizon Health Corporation and cross-petitioners, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
07/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due August 24, 2016; Respondents' brief is due September 13, 2016; Reply brief is due September 28, 2016.
07/21/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, et al.
07/20/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Care Corporation has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due August 24, 2016; Respondents' brief is due September 13, 2016; Reply brief is due September 28, 2016.
07/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Horizon Health Care Corporation.
07/13/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
06/24/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
06/24/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than July 25, 2016; Response brief due August 15, 2016; Reply brief due August 30, 2016.
05/31/2016Reply to Response Reply in support of Cross Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, et al.
05/16/2016Response to Petition Response to Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
05/11/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
05/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Response is due on May 16, 2016.
05/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
04/22/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Jeff D. Balcombe.
04/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp. and Acadia Healthcare Co. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on May 11, 2016.
04/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp. and Acadia Healthcare Co.
04/07/2016Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address of Jeff Nobles filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., et al.
03/11/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested responses to both petitions for review due no later than April 11, 2016.
02/09/2016Case forwarded to Court  
02/09/2016Case forwarded to Court  
01/07/2016Letter Filed Letter informs the Court that an Amended Petition will be filed by Monday, January 11, 2016.  Filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
01/05/2016Call received Call received from counsel for Petitioner informing the court that an amended petition will likely be filed rather than the corrected petition.
01/04/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corporation.
01/04/2016Petition for Review #2 Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, et al.
12/02/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due January 4, 2016.
12/02/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp.
12/02/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due January 4, 2016.
12/02/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Co.
11/03/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review of Acadia Healthcare Co. is due no later than December 2, 2015.
11/02/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review #2 filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Co.
10/22/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due December 2, 2015.  
10/22/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Horizon Health Corp.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/24/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Psychiatric Resource Partners, Inc.RespondentMr. Richard D. Hayes  
Mr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Alia Susan Wynne
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Mr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Piechocki, John M.RespondentMr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Mr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Alia Susan Wynne
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Mr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Horizon Health CorporationPetitionerMs. Kendyl Hanks
Mr. Victor D. Vital
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Ms. Mary Olga Lovett
Mr. Alan W. Hersh
Ms. Natalie D. Thompson
Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.RespondentMr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Mr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Alia Susan Wynne
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Mr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Bayma, Barbara H.RespondentAlia Susan Wynne
Mr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Mr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Mr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Palus, Timothy J.RespondentMr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Alia Susan Wynne
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Mr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Mr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Balcombe, Jeff D.Amicus CuriaeDarren Lee McCarty
Ulasewicz, Peter D.RespondentMr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Alia Susan Wynne
Mr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Mr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Saul, Michael A.RespondentMr. Stephen J. Roppolo
Mr. Richard D. Hayes  
Alia Susan Wynne
Mr. Nicholas D. Stepp  
Mr. R. William (Bill) Wood
Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly
Mr. Jeffery T. Nobles
Mr. Jesse L. Cromwell
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Rev & Rend/Rev & Rem 
472 SW3d 74, 07-23-15 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel 
Trial Court Information
16th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Sherry L. Shipman 
2011-10846-16 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site