Supreme Court

Case: 15-0780    
15-0780
10/09/2015
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
BMT O & G TX, L.P., GOLIAD O & G TX, L.P., WD O & G TX, L.P., KEYSTONE O & G TX, L.P. AND THRU LINE O & G TX, L.P. 
CLAYTON WILLIAMS ENERGY, INC. AND CHESAPEAKE EXPLORATION, L.L.C. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/2017Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerReply in support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, LP, et al.
02/22/2017Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
02/22/2017Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, LLC.
11/21/2016Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BMT O & G, L.P., et al.
11/21/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Texas Land & Mineral Owners.
09/07/2016Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
07/22/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C., et al.
07/22/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
05/02/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
03/02/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Chesapeake Exploration, LLC's Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX. L.P., et al.
02/16/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
02/16/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, LLC.
11/18/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
03/10/2017Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
02/28/2017Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Reply in support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, LP, et al.
02/23/2017Call received Call received from petitioners informing the Court that a reply in support of the motion for rehearing is forth coming.  
02/22/2017Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
02/22/2017Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, LLC.
01/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedJoint Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses to Motion for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Responses to Motion for Rehearing are due February 22, 2017.
01/18/2017Electronic communication received from Party Received email from Petitioners' counsel stating that Petitioners do not oppose the motion for extension of time request.
01/18/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Petitioners' counsel inquiring whether Petitioners are opposed or unopposed to motion for extension of time request.
01/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C. and Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
01/06/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than January 23, 2017.
11/22/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/21/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Brief of Texas Land & Mineral Owners.
11/21/2016Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BMT O & G, L.P., et al.
10/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due on November 22, 2016.
10/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX. L.P., et al.
10/21/2016Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/07/2016Reply Brief Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
07/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due September 7, 2016.
07/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
07/22/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C., et al.
07/22/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
06/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Respondents' brief is due July 22, 2016; and Reply brief is due August 8, 2016.
06/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc., et al.
05/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Briefs on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Briefs are due June 22, 2016; Reply Brief is due July 7, 2016.
05/17/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Briefs on the Merits filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C. and Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
05/02/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
04/12/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
04/04/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 8th COA
04/01/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested: Petitioner’s brief due no later than May 2, 2016, Response brief due May 23, 2016, Reply brief due June 7, 2016.
03/02/2016Reply to Response Reply to Chesapeake Exploration, LLC's Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX. L.P., et al.
02/16/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
02/16/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, LLC.
01/15/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 16, 2016.
12/15/2015Case forwarded to Court  
12/14/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
12/14/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C.
11/18/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P., et al.
10/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due November 18, 2015.
10/09/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of BMT O & G TX, L.P.,
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/10/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Keystone O & G TX, L.P.PetitionerMr. David E. Keltner
Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.RespondentMr. Richard E. Booth
Mr. Steven C. Kiser
WD O & G TX, L.P.PetitionerMr. David E. Keltner
Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C.RespondentMr. John A. "Jad" Davis Jr.
Mr. Jacob M. Davidson
Mr. Ryan D. Clinton  
Thru Line O & G TX, L.P.PetitionerMr. David E. Keltner
BMT O & G TX, L.P.PetitionerMr. Jeffrey Robert Grable
Mr. Robert C. Grable
Ms. Marianne M. Auld
Mr. David E. Keltner
Goliad O & G TX, L.P.PetitionerMr. David E. Keltner
Texas Land & Mineral OwnersAmicus CuriaeMs. Laura Buchanan
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
473 SW3d 341, 07-08-15 
8th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Yvonne Rodriguez 
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court 
Reeves 
Honorable Bob Parks 
12-02-20072-CVR 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site