Supreme Court

Case: 15-0730    
15-0730
09/24/2015
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
NBRC PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION 
CRAIG ZGABAY AND TAMMY ZGABAY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/14/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Petition filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association.
12/16/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review. On behalf of Craig and Tammy Zgabay.
11/30/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The Texas Chapters of Community Associations Institute.
10/27/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/12/2016Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
04/01/2016Petition for Review disposedDenied 
01/14/2016Reply to Response Reply to Petition filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association.
12/17/2015MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due January 14, 2016.
12/16/2015Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association.
12/16/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Craig and Tammy Zgabay.
12/04/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Petition for Review due no later than January 4, 2016.
11/30/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The Texas Chapters of Community Associations Institute.
11/03/2015Case forwarded to Court  
10/28/2015Response Waiver filed Waiver of Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Craig and Tammy Zgabay.
10/27/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association.
09/25/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association has been granted. Petition due October 27, 2015.
09/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of NBRC Property Owners Association.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/12/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Zgabay, TammyRespondentMr. J. Patrick Sutton  
NBRC Property Owners AssociationPetitionerMr. Tommy Levi Newton Jr.
Mr. Wade C. Crosnoe
Mr. Brian D. Hensley
Texas Chapters of Community Associations InstituteAmicus CuriaeMr. Darryl Wayne Pruett
Mr. George Verner Basham III
Glenn Keith Weichert
Zgabay, CraigRespondentMr. J. Patrick Sutton  
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 08-28-15 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable David E. Puryear 
Trial Court Information
433rd District Court 
Comal 
Honorable Dibrell W. Waldrip 
C2014-0501C 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site