Supreme Court

Case: 15-0712    
15-0712
09/17/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. 
ORCA ASSETS G.P., L.L.C. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
11/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
12/29/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
10/31/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
08/18/2016Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
08/11/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
03/28/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
02/10/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
10/29/2015Amended PetitionPetitionerHyperlinker Petition for Review, filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.
10/26/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Evan A. Young; Argued on behalf of respondent by David Gaultney
11/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
11/06/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
10/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form received on behalf of respondent, Orca Assets, G.P., L.L.C. Oral Argument will be presented by David Gaultney of MehaffyWeber, P.C. of Austin, Texas.
10/04/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Evan A. Young with Baker Botts LLP of Austin, Texas filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
05/05/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel of Record and Designation of New Lead Counsel filed on behalf of Orca Assetts G.P., L.L.C.
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/10/2017Petition for Review granted  
01/10/2017Designation of Lead Counsel  Lead Counsel Notice of Mr. Butch Boyd of Butch Boyd Law Firm filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
12/29/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
12/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply Brief is due December 30, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will not be considered.
12/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank.
11/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on December 15, 2016.
11/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
10/31/2016Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
09/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief is granted. Response Brief is due October 31, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will not be considered. Reply Brief is due November 15, 2016.
09/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
08/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's brief is due September 30, 2016; Reply brief is due October 17, 2016.
08/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
08/18/2016Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
08/11/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
07/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's Brief is due on August 11, 2016. Respondent's Brief is due on August 31, 2016. Reply Brief is due on September 15, 2016.
07/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
06/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petitioner's Brief is due July 27, 2016. further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. The Response Brief is due August 16, 2016. The Reply Brief is due August 31, 2016.
06/10/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
06/07/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
05/31/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
05/27/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than June 27, 2016, Response brief due July 18, 2016, Reply brief due August 2, 2016.
03/28/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
02/17/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion to Extend Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review is granted. Reply is due March 28, 2016. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/17/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al.
02/10/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
01/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Orca Assets, G.P., L.L.C. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due February 10, 2016.
01/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Orca Assets, G.P., L.L.C.
12/11/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 11, 2016.
11/10/2015Case forwarded to Court  
11/03/2015Response Waiver filed Waiver of Response filed on behalf of Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.
10/29/2015Amended Petition Hyperlinker Petition for Review, filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.
10/26/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.
09/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al. has been granted. Petition for Review is due October 26, 2015.
09/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/07/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.PetitionerMr. David Jed Williams
Ms. Jessica B. Pulliam
Mr. Thomas R. Phillips
Ms. Stephanie F. Cagniart  
Mr. Evan A. Young
Mr. Kevin M. Beiter
Orca Assets G.P., L.L.C.RespondentMr. David B. Gaultney
Mr. James G. Bennett
Ms. Wendy Marcia Bishop  
Ms. Deborah G. Hankinson
Ms. Stephanie D. Nelson
Mr. Ernest W. Boyd
Ms. Patricia D. Chamblin
Ms. Elana S. Einhorn
Mr. H. Allen Pennington Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 08-11-15 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable David J. Schenck 
Trial Court Information
44th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Carlos Raul Cortez 
DC-12-05303  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site