Supreme Court

Case: 15-0688    
15-0688
09/10/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
JACK PIDGEON AND LARRY HICKS 
MAYOR SYLVESTER TURNER AND CITY OF HOUSTON 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/26/2017Additional citations received.RespondentNotice of Supplemental Authority filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner, et al.
04/04/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Genessa Eddy.
03/20/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Maggie Jackson.
03/17/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus letter of Chris D. Grayson.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Letter.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Letter of Sandra Martinez, Ph.D.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Letter of Bonnie J. Pepin.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedAmicus Curiae Amicus letter filed on behalf of Laura Sweet.
03/07/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Jennifer Carson.
03/07/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Emma Asson.
03/01/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of the City of Houston and Mayor Sylvestor Turner.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Charles W. "Rocky" Rhodes of Houston, Texas.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Gary J. Gates, PhD, Kerith J. Conron, SCD, and Taylor N.T. Brown, MPP in support of respondents submitted by Puneet Kohli, Adam Romero, Thomas Watson, and Matthew Rand.
02/28/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitionerBrief in Response to Respondent's Letter of February 24, 2017 filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of GLBTQ Advocates & Defenders, et al. in support of respondent. Submitted by Rebecca Robertson of ACLU of Texas.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae of the Anti-Defamation League in support of Respondents. Submitted by Mark Trachtenberg of Haynes and Boone, LLP of Houston, Texas.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of the DeLeon Plaintiffs - Cleopatra De Leon, Nicole Dimetman, Victor Holmes, and Mark Phariss—in Support of Respondents. Submitted by Jason P. Steed of Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of L.J. and M.P., a married couple, and Equality Texas submitted by Kelly Sandill and Gene L. Locke of Houston, Texas.
02/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Law and Family Law Professors in Support of Respondents. Submitted by Christopher M. Odell of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP of Houston, Texas.
02/24/2017Letter brief RespondentLetter Brief filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and City of Houston.
02/23/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter received on behalf of Diana Finfrock Farrar and Charlotte Reed Moellering.  Submitted by Kyle Farrar of Ikard Wynne LLP and Taylor Romero of Cain & Skarnulis, Austin, Texas.
02/22/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Lawyers for America in Support of Mayor Turner and the City of Houston. Submitted by Brian P. Lauten with Deans & Lyons, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/17/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief recieved from Foundation for Moral Law.  Sumbitted by James J.S. Johnson with Institute for Creation Research of Dallas, Texas.
02/16/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received from International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.  Submitted by Elizabeth G. Bloch with Husch Blackwell LLP, of Austin, Texas.
02/13/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Various Amicus Curiae letters received February 13, 2017.
02/09/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Various Amicus Curiae letters received February 9, 2017.
02/07/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Various Amicus Curiae letters received on February 7, 2017.
02/06/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Kenneth L. Smith.
02/02/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Various Amicus Curiae letters received on February 2, 2017.
01/31/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Various Amicus Curiae letters received on January 31, 2017.
01/31/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Richard A. Nedbalek.
01/30/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Various Amicus Curiae letters received on January 30, 2017.
01/26/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Kenneth L. Busch.
01/25/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Sharon Kass.
01/20/2017Petition Reinstated  
12/05/2016Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and City of Houston.
10/27/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Governor Greg Abbott, Lieutenant Governor Dan Patrick, and Attorney General Ken Paxton in support of petitioners.
10/26/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Will Metcalf, State Representative Houst District 16.
10/17/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
10/14/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of State Senators, State Representatives, and numerous Conservatives leaders throughout Texas. Submitted by A. Keith Strahan of Houston, Texas.
10/03/2016Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
07/13/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
06/13/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner, et al.
05/09/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
12/11/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
11/30/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Mayor Annise Parker, et  al.
09/10/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/25/2017Letter Received Letter received from Supreme Court of the United States, Office of the Clerk, petition for writ of certiorari was filed on September 15, 2017 and placed on the docket September 20, 2017 as No. 17-424.
08/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Motion for Rehearing due September 15, 2017.
08/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and City of Houston.
07/21/2017Letter Filed Courtesy copy of supplemental clerk's record request filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvestor Turner, et al.
07/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing s due August 16, 2017.
07/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and City of Houston.
06/30/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/30/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment, vacates the trial court's orders, and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Boyd delivered the opinion of the Court.
(6/30/2017 9:52:55 AM) 150688.pdf, 15-0688.jmt.pdf
06/27/2017Letter Filed Response to Respondent's Additional Cites filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
06/26/2017Additional citations received. Notice of Supplemental Authority filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner, et al.
04/04/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Genessa Eddy.
03/20/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Maggie Jackson.
03/17/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus letter of Chris D. Grayson.
03/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Rebecca Robertson in Support of Walter Dellinger's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
03/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Walter Dellinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Sandra Martinez, Ph.D.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Bonnie J. Pepin.
03/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus letter filed on behalf of Laura Sweet.
03/10/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Called Mr. Dellinger regarding his motion for pro hac vice.
03/07/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Jennifer Carson.
03/07/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Letter Brief of Emma Asson.
03/01/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Jonathan F. Mitchell; Argued on behalf of respondents by Douglas W. Alexander
03/01/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of the City of Houston and Mayor Sylvestor Turner.
02/28/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Brief in Response to Respondent's Letter of February 24, 2017 filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Charles W. "Rocky" Rhodes of Houston, Texas.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Puneet Kohli in Support of Matthew P. Rand's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Matthew P. Rand to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Puneet Kohli in Support of Thomas B. Watson's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Thomas B. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Puneet Kohli in Support of Adam P. Romero's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/28/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Adam P. Romero to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/28/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Three at Counsel Table granted
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Gary J. Gates, PhD, Kerith J. Conron, SCD, and Taylor N.T. Brown, MPP in support of respondents submitted by Puneet Kohli, Adam Romero, Thomas Watson, and Matthew Rand.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Rebecca Robertson in Support of Waler Delliger's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae GLBTQ Advocates & Defenders, et al.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of GLBTQ Advocates & Defenders, et al. in support of respondent. Submitted by Rebecca Robertson of ACLU of Texas.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Puneet Kohli in Support of Adam P. Romero's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Gary J. Gates, Kerith J. Conron, and Taylor N.T. Brown.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Puneet Kohli in Support of Thomas B. Watson's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Gary J. Gates, Kerith J. Conron, and Taylor N.T. Brown.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Puneet Kohli in Support of Matthew P. Rand's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Gary J. Gates, Kerith J. Conron, and Taylor N.T. Brown.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Walter Dellinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae GLBTQ Advocates & Defenders, et al.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Matthew P. Rand to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Gary J. Gates, Kerith J. Conron, and Taylor N.T. Brown.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Thomas B. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Gary J. Gates, Kerith J. Conron, and Taylor N.T. Brown.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Adam P. Romero to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Amicus Curiae, Gary J. Gates, Kerith J. Conron, and Taylor N.T. Brown.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae of the Anti-Defamation League in support of Respondents. Submitted by Mark Trachtenberg of Haynes and Boone, LLP of Houston, Texas.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of the DeLeon Plaintiffs - Cleopatra De Leon, Nicole Dimetman, Victor Holmes, and Mark Phariss—in Support of Respondents. Submitted by Jason P. Steed of Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of L.J. and M.P., a married couple, and Equality Texas submitted by Kelly Sandill and Gene L. Locke of Houston, Texas.
02/24/2017Miscellaneous Motion Motion for Three at Counsel Table filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
02/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae Constitutional Law and Family Law Professors in Support of Respondents. Submitted by Christopher M. Odell of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP of Houston, Texas.
02/24/2017Letter brief  Letter Brief filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and City of Houston.
02/23/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter received on behalf of Diana Finfrock Farrar and Charlotte Reed Moellering.  Submitted by Kyle Farrar of Ikard Wynne LLP and Taylor Romero of Cain & Skarnulis, Austin, Texas.
02/22/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Lawyers for America in Support of Mayor Turner and the City of Houston. Submitted by Brian P. Lauten with Deans & Lyons, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/17/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief recieved from Foundation for Moral Law.  Sumbitted by James J.S. Johnson with Institute for Creation Research of Dallas, Texas.
02/16/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received from International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.  Submitted by Elizabeth G. Bloch with Husch Blackwell LLP, of Austin, Texas.
02/16/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel - Douglas W. Alexander and Nicholas Bacarisse will appear as additional counsel of record for Respondents filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner, et al.
02/16/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of Mayor Sylvestor Turner and City of Houston. Oral Argument will be presented by Douglas W. Alexander of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP of Austin, TX.
02/14/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel.  Jonathan F. Mitchell will appear as co-counsel for Petitioners, Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
02/14/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to petitioner's counsel's office regarding Notice of Appearance of Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell.
02/13/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Various Amicus Curiae letters received February 13, 2017.
02/10/2017Electronic communication received from Party Emails sent to Justices of the Court.
02/09/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. Woodfill requesting notice of appearance be filed on behalf of Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell.
02/09/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Various Amicus Curiae letters received February 9, 2017.
02/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioners, Jack Pidgeon et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Jonathan F. Mitchell of Stanford, CA, and Jared R. Woodfill of the Woodfill Law Firm, P.C. of Houston, TX.
02/07/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Various Amicus Curiae letters received on February 7, 2017.
02/06/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Kenneth L. Smith.
02/02/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Various Amicus Curiae letters received on February 2, 2017.
01/31/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Various Amicus Curiae letters received on January 31, 2017.
01/31/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Richard A. Nedbalek.
01/30/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Various Amicus Curiae letters received on January 30, 2017.
01/26/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Kenneth L. Busch.
01/25/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Sharon Kass.
01/20/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 1, 2017.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
01/20/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/20/2017Petition for Review granted  
01/20/2017Petition Reinstated  
01/20/2017Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
12/05/2016Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and City of Houston.
11/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to File Response to Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Requested Response is due December 5, 2016.
11/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner and the City of Houston.
11/04/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than November 21, 2016
10/27/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Governor Greg Abbott, Lieutenant Governor Dan Patrick, and Attorney General Ken Paxton in support of petitioners.
10/26/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Will Metcalf, State Representative Houst District 16.
10/22/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communication Received regarding case.
10/22/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communication Received regarding case.
10/20/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communication Received regarding case.
10/20/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communication Received regarding case.
10/17/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
10/14/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of State Senators, State Representatives, and numerous Conservatives leaders throughout Texas. Submitted by A. Keith Strahan of Houston, Texas.
10/05/2016Call received Voicemail message left with Staff Attorney for Public information for Justice Guzman and the Court regarding merits of the case.  Clerk's Office and staff previously instructed caller to submit comments in writing as an amicus letter and serve the parties.
10/04/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communication Received regarding case.
10/04/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/03/2016Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
09/26/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communications Received regarding case.
09/26/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communications Received regarding case.
09/21/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communications Received regarding case.
09/19/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communications Received regarding case.
09/16/2016Electronic communication received from Party Various Electronic Communication Received regarding case.
09/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due October 3, 2016.
09/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
09/02/2016Justice(s) dissent to denial of petition  
09/02/2016Petition for Review disposedDeniedJustice Devine dissents to the denial of the petition for review.
(9/2/2016 11:43:49 AM) 150688d.pdf
07/13/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
06/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on July 13, 2016.
06/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
06/13/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mayor Sylvester Turner, et al.
05/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondents' brief is due June 14, 2016; and Reply brief is due June 29, 2016.
05/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Mayor and City of Houston.
05/09/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
04/14/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
04/13/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
04/08/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits requested: Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than May 9, 2016; Response brief due May 31, 2016; and Reply brief due June 15, 2016.
01/04/2016Letter Filed Letter of Additional Authority filed on behalf of the City of Houston.
12/11/2015Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon, et al.
11/30/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Mayor Annise Parker, et  al.
10/30/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Review due no later than November 30, 2015.
09/29/2015Case forwarded to Court  
09/23/2015Response Waiver filed Waiver of Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Mayor Annise Parker et al.
09/10/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jack Pidgeon and Larry Hicks.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/15/2017StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Constitutional Law and Family Law ProfessorsAmicus CuriaeMr. Andrew Bergman
Christopher Mohr O'Dell
Mr. Trenton David
Patrick, DanAmicus CuriaeDarrell D. Davila
City of HoustonRespondentMs. Kathleen Hopkins Alsina
Mr. Ronald C. Lewis
Mr. David L. Red
Ms. Donna L. Edmundson
Ms. Darah Lyn Eckert
Mr. Nicholas B. Bacarisse
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
Ms. Judith L. Ramsey
Mr. John B. Wallace
Rhodes, Charles W.Amicus CuriaeMr. C. W. "Rocky" Rhodes
State of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. David Austin Robert Nimocks
L.J. and M.P., a married coupleAmicus CuriaeMr. Gene L. Locke
Ms. Kelly S. Sandill
Smith, Kenneth L.Amicus CuriaeKenneth L. Smith
Nedbalek, Richard A.Amicus CuriaeMr. Richard A. Nedbalek
Peplin, Bonnie J.Amicus CuriaeMs. Bonnie J. Peplin
International Municipal Lawyers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Elizabeth G. Bloch
Lawyers for AmericaAmicus CuriaeMr. Christopher Scott Hamilton
Mr. Brian Patrick Lauten
Ms. Angela Annette Hunt
Carson, Jennifer Amicus CuriaeMs. Jennifer Carson
Busch, Kenneth Amicus CuriaeMr. Kenneth Busch
Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus CuriaeMs. Elizabeth G. Bloch
Moellering, Charlotte ReedAmicus CuriaeMr. Kyle T. Farrar
Ms. Taylor R. Romero
Paxton, KenAmicus CuriaeMr. Brantley D. Starr
Asson, Emma Amicus CuriaeMs. Emma Asson
Hicks, LarryPetitionerMr. Leif A. Olson
Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. Jared R. Woodfill
Mr. Jonathan M. Saenz
Gary J. Gates, PHD, Kerith J. Conron, SCD, and Taylor N.T. Brown, MPPAmicus CuriaeMr. Puneet Kohli
Mr. Matthew P. Rand
Mr. Thomas B. Watson
Mr. Adam P. Romero
Eddy, Genessa Amicus CuriaeMs. Genessa Eddy
Metcalf, Will Amicus CuriaeMr. Will Metcalf
GLBTQ Advocates & Defenders, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., National Center for Lesbian Rights, American Civil Liberties Union of Texas, and American Civil Liberties Untion FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. Kenneth D. Upton Jr.
Ms. Rebecca Robertson
State RepresentativesAmicus CuriaeMr. Terry W. Yates
Mr. Briscoe Cain III
Mr. Adam Strahan
Equality TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Gene L. Locke
Ms. Kelly S. Sandill
Jackson, Maggie Amicus CuriaeMaggie Jackson
Abbott, GregAmicus CuriaeMr. James D. Blacklock
De Leon, Cleopatra; Dimetman, Nicole; Holmes, Victor; and Phariss, MarkAmicus CuriaeMr. Jason P. Steed
Turner, Mayor Sylvester RespondentMs. Kathleen Hopkins Alsina
Mr. Nicholas B. Bacarisse
Ms. Darah Lyn Eckert
Mr. John B. Wallace
Mr. Ronald C. Lewis
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
Ms. Judith L. Ramsey
Ms. Donna L. Edmundson
Mr. David L. Red
Farrar, Diana FinfrockAmicus CuriaeMs. Taylor R. Romero
Mr. Kyle T. Farrar
Grayson, Chris D.Amicus CuriaeMr. Chris D. Grayson
Pidgeon, JackPetitionerMr. Jonathan M. Saenz
Mr. Leif A. Olson
Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. Jared R. Woodfill
State SenatorsAmicus CuriaeMr. Briscoe Cain III
Mr. Adam Strahan
Mr. Terry W. Yates
Anti-Defamation LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Institute for Creation ResearchAmicus CuriaeMr. James J. S. Johnson
Numerous Conservatives Leaders throughout TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Terry W. Yates
Mr. Briscoe Cain III
Mr. Adam Strahan
Foundation for Moral LawAmicus CuriaeMr. James J. S. Johnson
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
477 SW3d 353, 07-28-15 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
310th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Lisa A. Millard 
2014-61812 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site