Supreme Court

Case: 15-0683    
15-0683
09/10/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
EXLP LEASING LLC AND EES LEASING LLC 
GALVESTON CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerPetitioners’ Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
10/09/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
06/14/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Mustang Rental Services, Inc. submitted by David G. Cabrales of Dallas, Texas.
02/13/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received from United Rentals, Inc.  Submitted by Mike Stenglein with King & Spalding LLP of Austin, Texas.
02/07/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked Consolidated Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
02/06/2017Reply Brief** See RemarksConsolidated Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Appraisal Districts.
02/06/2017Reply BriefPetitionerConsolidated Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
12/22/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentConsolidated Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
12/22/2016Brief on the Merits** See RemarksConsolidated Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Taxpayers.
11/01/2016Brief on the Merits** See RemarksConsolidated Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Appraisal Districts.
11/01/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerConsolidated Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
04/26/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC.
03/21/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
12/15/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of the State of Texas.
11/24/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/2017Post submission brief filed Petitioners’ Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
10/10/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Evan A. Young; Argued on behalf of respondent by Anthony P. Brown
10/09/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District. Oral Argument will be presented by Anthony P. Brown of McLeod, Alexander, Powel & Apffel, P.C. of Galveston, Texas.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, EXLP Leasing LLC and EES Leasing LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Evan A. Young of Baker Botts LLP of Austin, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 10, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/14/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Mustang Rental Services, Inc. submitted by David G. Cabrales of Dallas, Texas.
03/10/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/10/2017Petition for Review granted  
02/13/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received from United Rentals, Inc.  Submitted by Mike Stenglein with King & Spalding LLP of Austin, Texas.
02/07/2017Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Consolidated Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
02/06/2017Reply Brief Consolidated Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Appraisal Districts.
02/06/2017Reply Brief Consolidated Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
12/22/2016Brief on the Merits Consolidated Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Taxpayers.
12/22/2016Brief on the Merits Consolidated Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
11/04/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedRespondent Galveston Central Appraisal District's Motion for Access to Sealed Records denied.
11/01/2016Brief on the Merits Consolidated Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Appraisal Districts.
11/01/2016Brief on the Merits Consolidated Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners EXLP Leasing LLC & EES Leasing LLC.
10/25/2016Response to Motion filed Response to Motion for Access to Sealed Records filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
10/25/2016Call received Mr. Ben Gelison called to inform the Court that petitioner will be filing a response to the motion for access to sealed records by the end of business today.
10/21/2016Miscellaneous Motion Motion for Access to Sealed Records filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
10/04/2016Call received Received phone call from legal assistant of McLeod Alexander Powel & Apffel regarding the appellate records in cases 15-0683, 15-0965, 15-0969, 15-0970 and 15-0971, which have been consolidated for briefing. She said she would like to have access to the records including the sealed portions.
09/19/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedAgreed Motion of Consolidated Briefing Schedule granted.
09/15/2016Miscellaneous Motion Agreed Motion of Consolidated Briefing Schedule filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
09/07/2016Electronic communication sent to Party Electronic communication sent from the Clerk of the Court to parties in response to letter, filed on September 6, 2016 in case no. 15-0683, requesting clarification of Court's request for briefs on the merits.
09/07/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/06/2016Letter Filed Letter requesting clarification of briefing request filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
09/06/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
09/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested in cases 15-0683, 15-0965, 15-0969, 15-0970, and 15-0971:  Petitioners' brief due no later than October 3, 2016; Response brief due no later than October 24, 2016; Reply brief due November 8, 2016.
04/26/2016Reply to Response Reply in Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC.
03/23/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted.  Reply is due April 26, 2016.  Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will not be considered.
03/23/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC.
03/21/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
02/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due March 21, 2016.
02/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Galveston Central Appraisal District.
01/29/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 29, 2016.
12/29/2015Case forwarded to Court  
12/15/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of the State of Texas.
11/24/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
11/03/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due November 30, 2015.
11/03/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing LLC, et al.
09/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing, LLC. et al. has been granted. Petition for Review is due November 9, 2015.
09/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review, filed on behalf of EXLP Leasing, LLC. et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/10/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EES Leasing LLCPetitionerMr. Evan Andrew Young
Mr. Paul R. Elliott
Mr. Thomas R. Phillips
Mr. Benjamin Allen 'Ben' Geslison
Mr. Renn G. Neilson
Mustang Rental Services, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. David G. Cabrales
State of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Kristofer S. Monson
Galveston Central Appraisal DistrictRespondentMr. Anthony P. Brown
Amanda D. Wright
Ms. Jocelyn Annette Holland
EXLP Leasing LLCPetitionerMr. Thomas R. Phillips
Mr. Evan Andrew Young
Mr. Renn G. Neilson
Mr. Paul R. Elliott
Mr. Benjamin Allen 'Ben' Geslison
United Rentals, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. F. Michael Stenglein
Ms. Martha Daniels
Mr. James P. Sullivan
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
475 SW3d 421, 08-25-15 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Justin Brett Busby 
Trial Court Information
10th District Court 
Galveston 
Honorable Kerry Lane Neves 
12-CV-2041 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site