Supreme Court

Case: 15-0509    
15-0509
07/09/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
MARCELA AND JOSE BUSTAMANTE, AS NEXT FRIENDS OF D.B. 
ENRIQUE N. PONTE, JR., M.D. AND PEDIATRIX MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/30/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter in Response to Post-Submission Letter of Petitioners filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
12/19/2016Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter in Response to Post-Submission Letter of Petitioners filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
12/14/2016Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost Submission Letter filed on behalf of Marcel and Jose Bustamante.
12/07/2016Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
08/12/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcel and Jose Bustamante.
06/27/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
06/27/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
04/07/2016Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcela Bustamante, et al.
12/28/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante.
12/09/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
11/09/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
08/26/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/29/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
09/29/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court.  Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court.
(9/29/2017 4:41:32 PM) 150509.pdf, 15-0509.jmt.pdf
09/08/2017Order of the Court IssuedSeverance of action pending before Supreme CourtPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 56.3, the Court severs the portion of the proceedings against Respondents Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A. d/b/a El Paso Eye Care Center from cause number 15-0509 into case number 17-0727, styled Marcela and Jose Bustamante, as next friends of D.B. v. Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A. d/b/a El Paso Eye Care Center.  Case number 17-0727, Marcela and Jose Bustamante, as next friends of D.B. v. Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A. d/b/a El Paso Eye Care Center, is dismissed. The remainder of the appeal in 15-0509, restyled Marcela and Jose Bustamante, as next friends of D.B. v. Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D. and Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc. is reinstated and remains pending before this Court.
09/08/2017cause reinstated to active docket  
09/08/2017Abatement Order Lifted Abatement order issued June 16, 2017 is lifted.  Cause reinstated.
09/08/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedJoint Motion to Lift Abatement granted
09/08/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedJoint Motion to Sever and Dismiss with Prejudice granted
09/08/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing dismissed as mootPetitioners Marcela and Jose Bustamante's Motion to Grant Motion to Sever and Motion to Abate dismissed as moot
09/08/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing dismissed as mootPetitioners' and Llamas-Soforo Respondents' Unopposed Joint Motion to Sever and Abate Appeal to Permit Proceedings in the Trial Court to Effectuate Settlement dismissed as moot
08/21/2017Miscellaneous Motion Joint Motion to Lift Abatement filed on behalf of Petitioners, Marcela and Jose Bustamante, and Respondents, Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A.
08/21/2017Miscellaneous Motion Joint Motion to Sever and Dismiss with Prejudice filed on behalf of Petitioners, Marcela and Jose Bustamante, and Respondents, Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A.
08/15/2017Miscellaneous Motion Motion to Extend Abatement (incorporated with second joint status report) filed on behalf of Marcela Bustamante, et al.
08/15/2017Status report filed Second Joint Status Report filed on behalf of Marcela Bustamante, et al.
08/02/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address filed on behalf of counsel for respondents Enrique Ponte, M.D. and Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc.
06/16/2017Status Report requested Status report requested due no later than August 15, 2017.
06/16/2017Order of the Court IssuedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedThe Court's abatement order of March 31, 2017 expired by its own terms on May 30, 2017.  The abatement is extended until further order of this Court.
06/01/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted Bustamante's counsel and requested second fee for the motion to extend abatement.
06/01/2017Miscellaneous Motion Motion to Grant Motion to Sever incorporated with Motion to Extend Abatement filed on behalf of petitioners Marcela Bustamante, et al. and repondents Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
05/31/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Ms. Saberian's office. Requested that the Status Report be resubmitted in the form of a motion and paid for.
05/30/2017Status report filed Joint Status Report filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al.
03/31/2017Order of the Court IssuedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedThis cause is removed from the Court's active docket until May 30, 2017.
03/31/2017Petition for Review disposedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas Abated 
03/23/2017Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Joint Motion to Sever and Abate Appeal to Permit Proceedings in the Trial Court to Effectuate Settlement filed on behalf of petitioners Marcela Bustamante, et al. and repondents Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
01/30/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter in Response to Post-Submission Letter of Petitioners filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
12/19/2016Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter in Response to Post-Submission Letter of Petitioners filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
12/14/2016Post submission brief filed Post Submission Letter filed on behalf of Marcel and Jose Bustamante.
12/08/2016Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Craig T. Enoch and Amy L. Saberian; argued on behalf of respondents, Enrique N. Ponte, Jr. M.D., et al. by Douglas W. Alexander; argued on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al. by Diana L. Faust
12/07/2016Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
11/10/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A. d/b/a El Paso Eye Center and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D. Oral Argument will be presented by Diana L. Faust of Cooper & Scully, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
11/09/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Craig T. Enoch and Amy L Saberian on behalf of Marcel and Jose Bustamante.
11/08/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr M.D.and Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by Douglas W. Alexander of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP of Austin, Texas.
09/23/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 8, 2016.  (Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes)
09/23/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/23/2016Petition for Review granted  
09/20/2016Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address for Craig Enoch and Amy Saberian, attorneys for Petitioners, filed on behalf of Marcel and Jose Bustamante.
08/12/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcel and Jose Bustamante.
07/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED.  Reply brief is due August 12, 2016.
07/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners Marcela and Jose Bustamante.
07/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of Time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due August 2, 2016.
07/06/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners Marcela and Jose Bustamante.
06/27/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
06/27/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
05/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedJoint Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Respondents' brief is due June 27, 2016; Reply brief is due July 12, 2016.
05/26/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., and Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc. and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A.
04/25/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedLlamas-Soforo's Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondents' brief is due May 27, 2016; Reply brief is due June 13, 2016.
04/25/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D. and Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D., P.A.
04/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondents' brief is due May 27, 2016; Reply brief is due June 13, 2016.
04/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., and Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc.
04/07/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcela Bustamante, et al.
03/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al. has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is due April 7, 2016; Respondents' brief is due April 27, 2016; Reply brief is due May 12, 2016.
03/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al.
02/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioners' brief is due March 23, 2016; Respondents' brief is due April 12, 2016; Reply brief is due April 27, 2016.
02/05/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al.
01/26/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/22/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
01/22/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than February 22, 2016; Response brief due March 14, 2016; Reply brief due March 29, 2016.
12/28/2015Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante.
12/09/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Llamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
11/19/2015MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. Reply is due December 28, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/19/2015Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply. On behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante.
11/09/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., et al.
11/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due December 9, 2015.
11/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio LLamas-Soforo, M.D., et al.
10/09/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Review due on November 9, 2015.
09/08/2015Case forwarded to Court  
09/02/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Enrique N. Ponte, Jr., M.D., and Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc.
08/27/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforo, M.D.
08/26/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante, et al.
08/13/2015Designation of Lead Counsel  Lead Counsel for Respondent is Diana Faust.
08/12/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed second motion for extension of time, filed on behalf of Marcela Bustamante, et al has been granted. Petition due August 26, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED
08/12/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed second motion for extension of time, filed on behalf of Marcela Bustamante, et al.
07/10/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante has been granted. Petition due August 12, 2015.
07/09/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Marcela and Jose Bustamante.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/16/2017StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pediatrix Medical Services, Inc.RespondentJennifer L. Murphy
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Mr. Timothy D. Ryan
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
Ms. Susan C. Cooley
Ms. Jennifer Gossom Martin
Ms. Lisa M. Wilson
Llamas-Soforro, Senior, Jorge FabioRespondentMs. Michelle E. Robberson  
Mr. R. Brent Cooper
Ms. Diana L. Faust
Ms. Elizabeth M. Fraley
Mr. Paul M. Bracken
Ms. Heather A. Kanny
Jorge Fabio Llamas-Soforro, M.D., P.A. d/b/a El Paso Eye CenterRespondentMs. Diana L. Faust
Ms. Elizabeth M. Fraley
Ms. Heather A. Kanny
Mr. R. Brent Cooper
Ms. Michelle E. Robberson  
Mr. Paul M. Bracken
Bustamante, MarcelaPetitionerMr. J. Stephen Gibson
Mr. Domingo A. Garcia
Mr. James E. Girards
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Mr. Michael W. Huddleston
Bustamante, JosePetitionerMr. Domingo A. Garcia
Mr. James E. Girards
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Mr. J. Stephen Gibson
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Mr. Michael W. Huddleston
Ponte, Junior, Enrique N.RespondentMr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Ms. Lisa M. Wilson
Ms. Susan C. Cooley
Jennifer L. Murphy
Mr. Douglas W. Alexander
Mr. Timothy D. Ryan
Ms. Jennifer Gossom Martin
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
490 SW3d 70, 05-28-15 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable William G. Whitehill 
Trial Court Information
101st District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Martin L. Lowy 
08-08056 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site