Supreme Court

Case: 15-0403    
15-0403
06/03/2015
Second Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
VIRGINIA O. KINSEL, AS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT FOR J. FRANK KINSEL, J. FRANK KINSEL, JR., CAROLE K. EDWARDS, AND CATHERINE K. COLLINS 
JANE O. LINDSEY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE LESEY B. KINSEL TRUST, ROBERT N. OLIVER, KEITH BRANYON AND JACKSON WALKER, LLP 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/2017Amended motion for rehearingRespondentAmended Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
07/06/2017Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
02/15/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Keith Branyon, et al.
02/15/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedEvent related to first petition filed in case.Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of John Schaefer, Jessica Schaefer, Hilary Kulik, Gretchen Thompson, Ronald Schaefer, Jr., and Matthew Schaefer (Schaefer Heirs) in support of Petitioner Virginia O. Kinsel, et al., submitted by Philip M. Ross of San Antonio.
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Jo Ann Rivera in support of Petitioners Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. Submitted by Philip M. Ross of San Antonio,  Texas.
01/13/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Richard T. Archer, David B. Archer, Carol Archer Bugg, John V. Archer, Karen Archer Ball, and Sherri Archer (the Archers) in support of Petitioners Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. Submitted by Laurie Ratliff of Ikard Golden Jones PC of Austin, Texas.
11/07/2016Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
11/07/2016Reply BriefEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
09/21/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
09/21/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virgina O. Kinsel, et al.
09/21/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Keith Branyon, et al.
07/01/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
07/01/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of cross petitioners, Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
03/04/2016Additional citations received.PetitionerLetter informs the Court of opinion issued in Anderson v.
Archer, Cause No. 03-13-00790-CV.  Filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
02/16/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
02/16/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
12/31/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Cross-Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel, et al.
12/31/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
12/30/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Keith Branyon and Jackson Walker, L.L.P.
08/19/2015Petition for Review #2PetitionerCross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
08/19/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/07/2017Amended motion for rehearing Amended Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
07/06/2017Case forwarded to Court  
07/06/2017Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
06/08/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedJoint Motion for Extension of Time to file Motions for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motions for Rehearing is due July 6, 2017.
06/08/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of petitioners, Virginia Kinsel, et al., and respondents, Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
05/26/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/26/2017Opinion issuedIssued 
05/26/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed/remanded to trial courtThe Court affirms the court of appeals’ judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Brown delivered the opinion of the Court.  (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
(5/26/2017 3:36:29 PM) 150403.pdf, 15-0403.jmt.pdf
02/16/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf petitioners/cross-respondents by Craig T. Enoch; Argued on behalf of respondents/cross-petitioners by William L. Kirkman; Argued on behalf of respondents by Wallace B. Jefferson.
02/16/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf petitioners/cross-respondents by Craig T. Enoch; Argued on behalf of respondents/cross-petitioners by William L. Kirkman; Argued on behalf of respondents by Wallace B. Jefferson.
02/15/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Keith Branyon, et al.
02/15/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Jo Ann Rivera in support of Petitioners Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. Submitted by Philip M. Ross of San Antonio,  Texas.
01/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Brief of John Schaefer, Jessica Schaefer, Hilary Kulik, Gretchen Thompson, Ronald Schaefer, Jr., and Matthew Schaefer (Schaefer Heirs) in support of Petitioner Virginia O. Kinsel, et al., submitted by Philip M. Ross of San Antonio.
01/27/2017Motion to expand time for oral argument disposedFiling granted in partJoint Motion for Additional Time to Present Oral Argument granted in part.  Time allotted to argue:  25/25 minutes
01/23/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Craig Enoch of Enoch Kever PLLC of Austin, Texas.
01/23/2017Response to Motion filed Response to Joint Motion for Additional Time for Oral Argument filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel.
01/23/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by William L. Kirkman of Fort Worth, Texas.
01/19/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Keith Branyon, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Wallace B. Jefferson of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP of Austin, Texas.
01/13/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Brief of Richard T. Archer, David B. Archer, Carol Archer Bugg, John V. Archer, Karen Archer Ball, and Sherri Archer (the Archers) in support of Petitioners Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. Submitted by Laurie Ratliff of Ikard Golden Jones PC of Austin, Texas.
01/13/2017Motion to expand time for oral argument Motion to Extend Time for Oral Argument filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
12/23/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentOral argument of this case will be conducted on Thursday, February 16, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. at LeTourneau University in Longview, Texas.  See TEX. CONST. ART. V., § 3(a).
12/23/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
12/23/2016Petition for Review granted  
12/23/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentOral argument of this case will be conducted on Thursday, February 16, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. at LeTourneau University in Longview, Texas.  See TEX. CONST. ART. V., § 3(a).
12/23/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
12/23/2016Petition for Review granted  
11/07/2016Reply Brief Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
11/07/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
09/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply Brief is due November 7, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will not be considered.
09/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits.
09/23/2016Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address for counsel Craig T. Enoch and Melissa A. Lorber filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
09/21/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virgina O. Kinsel, et al.
09/21/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Keith Branyon, et al.
09/21/2016Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
08/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. and Jane O. Lindsey, et al. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Respondents' brief is due September 21, 2016; Reply brief is due October 6, 2016.
08/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al. and Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
07/26/2016Case Record Filed  Requested Audio Exhibit No. 333 from the 7th COA received.
07/15/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Requested Audio Exhibit No. 333 from the 7th COA after granting of motion to transfer
07/15/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Request Transfer of Audio Exhibit granted
07/07/2016Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion to Request Transfer of Audio Exhibit filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel, et al.
07/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedJOINT Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of Time for this filing will be disfavored. Response Brief is due August 22, 2016; Reply Brief is due September 6, 2016.
07/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed JOINT Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioners/Cross-Respondents Virginia Kinsel, et al. and Respondents/Cross-Petitioners Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
07/06/2016Notice received Notice informs the Court of Robert N. Oliver's passing, and requests the notation of deceased by his name.
07/01/2016Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of cross petitioners, Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
07/01/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
06/13/2016Call received Mr. Enoch's office informed the Court that a motion for the court to request audio from the Court of Appeals will be filed since it was not included in the electronic record submitted.
05/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Briefs on the Merits is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Pet's Brief is due July 1, 2016; Response Brief is due July 21, 2016; Reply Brief is due August 5, 2016.
05/23/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Joint Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of petitioners Virginia Kinsel, et al., and cross-petitioners, Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
04/12/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
04/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedAgreed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioners' brief is due June 1, 2016; Respondents' brief is due June 21, 2016; and Reply brief is due July 6, 2016.
04/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
04/04/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 7th COA
04/01/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested: Petitioner’s brief due no later than May 2, 2016, Response brief due May 23, 2016, Reply brief due June 7, 2016.
03/15/2016Letter Filed Letter filed in response to petitioners' additional cites filed on behalf of Jackson Walker, LLP.
03/04/2016Additional citations received. Letter informs the Court of opinion issued in Anderson v.
Archer, Cause No. 03-13-00790-CV.  Filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
02/16/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
02/16/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
01/11/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petitions for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.  Reply is due February 16, 2016.
01/08/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
12/31/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
12/31/2015Response to Petition Response to Cross-Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel, et al.
12/30/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Keith Branyon and Jackson Walker, L.L.P.
12/03/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel and Jane Lindsey. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Response to Petition for Review due on December 31, 2015.
12/02/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel and Jane Lindsey.
10/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Responses are due December 16, 2015.  Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
10/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel and Jane Lindsey.
10/16/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Writ of Mandamus due no later than November 16, 2015.
10/16/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Writ of Mandamus due no later than November 16, 2015.
09/15/2015Case forwarded to Court  
09/15/2015Case forwarded to Court  
09/08/2015Response Waiver filed Waiver of Response filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
09/03/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
08/26/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Respondents Jackson Walker, LLP and M. Keith Branyon
08/19/2015Petition for Review #2 Cross-Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jane O. Lindsey and Robert N. Oliver.
08/19/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Virginia O. Kinsel, et al.
07/29/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel, et al, and Jane O. Lindsey, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition is due August 19, 2015.
07/29/2015Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Virginia Kinsel, et al, and Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
06/03/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetitions for Review are due August 5, 2015.
06/03/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed JOINT Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitions for Review. On behalf of petitioners/cross respondents, Virginia Kinsel, et al. and respondents, cross petitioners, Jane O. Lindsey, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/06/2017Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesMotion for Rehearing 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edwards, Carole K.PetitionerMs. Amy L. Saberian
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
J. Lyndell Kirkley
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Sean R. Looney
Schaefer, JessicaAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Ball, Karen ArcherAmicus CuriaeMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Schaefer, JohnAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Thompson, GretchenAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Kinsel, Jr., Joe BobPetitionerJ. Lyndell Kirkley
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Sean R. Looney
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Oliver, Robert N.RespondentMs. Susanna Johnson
Mr. William L. Kirkman
Ms. Shelly K.A. Messerli
Bugg, Carol ArcherAmicus CuriaeMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Branyon, M. KeithRespondentMr. Joseph "Joe" R. Greenhill III
Mr. John H. Cayce Jr.
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Ms. Rachel A. Ekery  
Mr. Frank Pierce Greenhaw IV
Mr. Matthew David Stayton
Mr. Marshall M. Searcy Jr.
Archer, SherriAmicus CuriaeMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Archer, David B.Amicus CuriaeMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Jackson Walker LLPRespondentMr. Matthew David Stayton
Mr. Frank Pierce Greenhaw IV
Mr. John H. Cayce Jr.
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Mr. Marshall M. Searcy Jr.
Mr. Joseph "Joe" R. Greenhill III
Lindsey, Jane O.RespondentMs. Shelly K.A. Messerli
Mr. William L. Kirkman
Ms. Susanna Johnson
Kinsel, Virginia O.PetitionerMr. Craig T. Enoch
Mr. Ty J. Jones  
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Ms. Lindy D. Jones
Ms. Laura L. Worsham
J. Lyndell Kirkley
Sean R. Looney
Kulik, HilaryAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Archer, Richard T.Amicus CuriaeMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Collins, Catherine K.PetitionerJ. Lyndell Kirkley
Sean R. Looney
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Kinsel, Jr., J. FrankPetitionerMr. Ty J. Jones  
Ms. Amy L. Saberian
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Ms. Lindy D. Jones
Ms. Laura L. Worsham
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Rivera, Jo AnnAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Mr. Raul Javier Guerra
Schaefer, Junior, RonaldAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Archer, John V.Amicus CuriaeMs. Laurie E. Ratliff
Schaefer, MatthewAmicus CuriaeMr. Philip M. Ross
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Ren/Pt 
518 SW3d 1, 04-10-15 
7th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Brian P. Quinn 
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ken Curry 
153-232668-08 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site