Supreme Court

Case: 15-0279    
15-0279
04/13/2015
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
IN RE COMMITMENT OF DENNIS RAY STUTEVILLE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/29/2015Reply to Response to Petition filed RelatorReply to Petition filed on behalf of Dennis Ray Stuteville.
06/24/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
04/13/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Dennis Ray Stuteville.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/29/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
09/18/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
06/29/2015Reply to Response to Petition filed  Reply to Petition filed on behalf of Dennis Ray Stuteville.
06/24/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
05/26/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than June 25, 2015.  
04/21/2015Case forwarded to Court  
04/16/2015Response Waiver filed Waiver Response filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
04/13/2015Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Affidavit of Indigency INCORPORATED with Appendix to Petition for Review. On behalf of Dennis Ray Stuteville
04/13/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dennis Ray Stuteville.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/29/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of Texas (Special Prosecution Unit, Civil Division) (SPU) RespondentMr. Samuel Denton  
Ms. Jacklyn Noelle Janis  
Ms. Melinda M. Fletcher
Stuteville, Dennis RayPetitionerMr. Kenneth D. Nash
Mr. John C. Moncure  
Mr. Nicholas Matthew Mensch  
Mr. Ronald Patrick Chin
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
463 SW3d 543, 03-10-15 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Russell T. Lloyd 
Trial Court Information
435th District Court 
Montgomery 
Honorable Michael Thomas Seiler 
12-12-13060-CV 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site