Supreme Court

Case: 15-0270    
15-0270
04/06/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
EXXONMOBIL CORPORATION 
LAZY R RANCH, LP; HELEN A. MCDANIEL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HELEN WILLIAMS INTER VIVOS TRUST, AND AS GENERAL PARTNER OF LAZY R RANCH, LP; AND JOSEPH WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HELEN WILLIAMS INTER VIVOS TRUST 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/16/2017Post submission brief filedRespondentRespondents' Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf o Lazy R Ranch, L.P., et al.
02/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of the Texas Farm Bureau in support of the respondents. Submitted by James D. Bradbury and Courtney Cox Smith of James D. Bradbury, PLLC of Austin, Texas.
11/04/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Association and Texas Land & Mineral Owners Association in support of Respondent's Brief on the Merits. Submitted by John B. McFarland and Arthur G. Uhl III.
03/17/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association in support of ExxonMobil Coporation's Petition for Review.  Submitted by Evan A. Young with Baker Botts, L.L.P. of Austin, Texas.
11/30/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerReply Brief filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corp.
11/12/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP, et al.
10/12/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corp.
08/27/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Petition filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corp.
08/12/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP, et al.
04/06/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corporation.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
02/24/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
02/24/2017Opinion issuedCourt affirms in part and reverses in part CA judgment and remands to trial courtThe Court affirms in part and reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court.  (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
(2/24/2017 3:01:00 PM) 150270.pdf, 15-0270.jmt.pdf
02/16/2017Post submission brief filed Respondents' Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf o Lazy R Ranch, L.P., et al.
02/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of the Texas Farm Bureau in support of the respondents. Submitted by James D. Bradbury and Courtney Cox Smith of James D. Bradbury, PLLC of Austin, Texas.
11/16/2016Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of Address for Michael Navarre: Beatty, Bangle, Strama, PC, 400 West 15th Street, Suite 1450, Austin, Texas 78701, (512) 879-5050.
11/07/2016Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Shannon H. Ratliff; Argued on behalf of respondents by Peter M. Kelly and Andrew Sher  (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
11/04/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Association and Texas Land & Mineral Owners Association in support of Respondent's Brief on the Merits. Submitted by John B. McFarland and Arthur G. Uhl III.
10/24/2016Notice of Appearance Notice of Apperance and Lead Counsel filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP, et al. Attorney, Mr. Peter M. Kelly is now the lead counsel for the respondents.
10/24/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Amended Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP. Oral Argument will be presented by Peter M. Kelly of Kelly, Durham & Pittard, LLP of Houston, Texas.
10/12/2016Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of Address filed on behalf of Andrew Sher.
10/11/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Andrew Sher on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP.
10/11/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corporation. Oral Argument will be presented by Shannon H. Ratliff of the Ratliff Law Firm, PLLC.
09/02/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 7, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes (Justice Lehrmann not sitting)
09/02/2016Petition for Review granted  
09/02/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
03/17/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association in support of ExxonMobil Coporation's Petition for Review.  Submitted by Evan A. Young with Baker Botts, L.L.P. of Austin, Texas.
11/30/2015Brief on the Merits Reply Brief filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corp.
11/12/2015Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP, et al.
11/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion to Extend Time to File a Response Brief on the Merits is granted. Respondent's Brief is due November 12, 2015; Reply Brief is due November 30, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed First Motion to Extend Time to File a Response Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Lazy R. Ranch, et al.
10/16/2015Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/12/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corp.
09/14/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 8th COA
09/11/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested: Petitioner’s brief due no later than October 12, 2015, Response brief due November 2, 2015, Reply brief due November 17, 2015.
08/27/2015Reply to Response Reply to Petition filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corp.
08/12/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, LP, et al.
07/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due August 12, 2015.
07/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extesnion of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lazy R Ranch, et al.
06/11/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than July 13, 2015.
05/12/2015Case forwarded to Court  
04/06/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of ExxonMobil Corporation.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/07/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Farm BureauAmicus CuriaeMs. Courtney Smith
Mr. James D. Bradbury
McDaniel, Helen A.RespondentMr. Peter M. Kelly
Mr. F. Leighton Durham III
Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Arthur G. Uhl III
Mr. Robert Park
Mr. John B. McFarland
Lazy R RanchRespondentMr. Peter M. Kelly
Mr. Justin Ryan Goodman
Mr. Andrew Sher
Mr. Adam Quentin Voyles
Mr. F. Leighton Durham III
Texas Oil & Gas AssoicationAmicus CuriaeMr. Carlos R. Romo  
Mr. Evan A. Young
ExxonMobil CorporationPetitionerMr. Michael Lynn Navarre
Mr. Shannon H. Ratliff
Williams, JoesphRespondentMr. Peter M. Kelly
Mr. F. Leighton Durham III
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
456 SW3d 332, 01-14-15 
8th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Yvonne Rodriguez 
Trial Court Information
109th District Court 
Winkler 
Honorable Martin Bert Muncy 
15,727  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site