Supreme Court

Case: 15-0248    
15-0248
03/30/2015
Second Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY 
LADDEX, LTD. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/2016Post submission brief filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
11/16/2016Post submission brief filedEvent related to first petition filed in case.Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of BP America Production Co.
10/10/2016Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
10/10/2016Exhibits in case/cause filedEvent related to first petition filed in case.Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of BP America.
04/18/2016Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Comapny.
03/23/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
03/08/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
02/29/2016Fully hyperlinked brief filedRespondentHyperlinked version of Respondent's Brief on the Mertis. On behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/29/2016Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/11/2016Fully hyperlinked brief filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Hyperlinked Petitioner's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/10/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/03/2016Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
10/26/2015Reply to ResponseEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply in Support of Petition for Review, filed on behalf of BP American Production Company.
09/09/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
06/18/2015Reply to ResponseEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply to Response to Cross Petition for Review. On behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
06/03/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Cross-Petition filed on behalf of BP America Prod. Co.
05/04/2015Petition for Review #2PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Respondent/Cross-Petitioner Laddex, LTD.
05/04/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
03/03/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
03/03/2017Opinion issuedIssued 
03/03/2017Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court.
(3/3/2017 3:43:35 PM) 150248.pdf, 15-0248.jmt.pdf
01/26/2017Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedMotion to Withdraw is granted.
01/26/2017Motion to Withdraw Filed Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Designation of Lead Counsel filed on behalf of BP America Production Co.
12/29/2016Post submission brief filed Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
11/16/2016Post submission brief filed Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of BP America Production Co.
10/11/2016Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent by Charles R. "Skip" Watson; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner by Joe L. Lovell
10/11/2016Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent by Charles R. "Skip" Watson; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner by Joe L. Lovell
10/10/2016Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
10/10/2016Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of BP America.
09/09/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of BP America Production Company. Oral argument will be presented by Charles R. "Skip" Watson, Jr. of Locke Lord LLP.
09/08/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent-cross petitioner, Laddex Ltd. The Oral Argument will be presented by attorney Joe L. Lovell  of Lovell Lovell Isern & Farabough, LLP of Amarillo Texas.
09/02/2016Petition for Review granted  
09/02/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 11, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/02/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/02/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 11, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/02/2016Petition for Review granted This case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 11, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/02/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
04/18/2016Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Comapny.
04/15/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Reply brief is due April 18, 2016.
04/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension fo Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Mertis filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
03/25/2016Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation notice for respondent Laddex Ltd's counsel, Mr. Joe L. Lovell. He will be out May 13 thru June 6, 2016.
03/23/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
03/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBP America Production's Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. BP America's Reply Brief is due April 14, 2016.
03/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of  Petitioner, BP America Production Company.
03/08/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
03/01/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedCorrected Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Cross-Respondent's brief is due March 8, 2016. Reply brief is due March 23, 2016.
03/01/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Corrected Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
03/01/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of BP America Production Company has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due March 7, 2016. Reply Brief is due March 22, 2016.
03/01/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
02/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Laddext, Ltd. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Respondent's Brief on the Merits is due on February 29, 2016. Reply Brief is due on March 17, 2016.
02/29/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/29/2016Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of Respondent's Brief on the Mertis. On behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/29/2016Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/29/2016Call received Call received from Mr. Farabough, counsel for respondent, stating that motion for extension of time for brief will be filed.
02/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's brief is due February 26, 2016; Reply brief is due March 14, 2016.
02/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/11/2016Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Petitioner's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/10/2016Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
02/04/2016Call received Call received from legal assistant for Mr. Watson, informing the court that the petitioner's brief on the merits was submitted yesterday but could not be filed due to embedded fonts error. Legal assistant is attempting to refile today.
02/03/2016Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
02/03/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedThird Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. BP Am. Production's Brief is due February 3, 2016; Resp's Brief is due February 23, 2016;  Reply Brief is due March 9, 2016.
02/03/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of BP America Production Company.
02/03/2016Call received Call received from petitioner attorney, Skip Watson, letting the Court know that a one day extension of time to file petitioner's brief will be filed today.
01/22/2016Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of BP America Production Company has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUEST FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's Brief is due February 2, 2016. Response Brief is due February 22, 2016. Reply Brief is due March 8, 2016.
01/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
01/19/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, LTD. has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's brief is due February 10, 2016; Respondent's brief is due March 1, 2016; Reply brief is due March 16, 2016.
01/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laddex, LTD.
12/29/2015Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel, John Smithee, on behalf of Respondent/Cross-Petitioner Laddex, Ltd.
12/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Cross-Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due January 20, 2016; Respondent's brief is due February 9, 2016; Reply brief is due February 24, 2016.
12/17/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cross-Petitioner, Laddex, Ltd.
12/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due January 20, 2016; Respondent's brief is due February 9, 2016; Reply brief is due February 24, 2015.
12/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
11/23/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 7th COA
11/20/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than December 21, 2015; Response brief due January 11, 2016; Reply brief due January 26, 2016.
10/26/2015Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review, filed on behalf of BP American Production Company.
10/05/2015MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of BP America Production Company has been granted. Reply due October 26, 2015.
09/17/2015Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
09/09/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
07/29/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due September 9, 2015.
07/28/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
07/10/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than August 10, 2015.
06/18/2015Reply to Response Reply to Response to Cross Petition for Review. On behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
06/09/2015Case forwarded to Court  
06/09/2015Case forwarded to Court  
06/04/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.
06/04/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Mr. Lovell.  Requested status of response to petition of BP American Production Co.
06/03/2015Response to Petition Response to Cross-Petition filed on behalf of BP America Prod. Co.
05/04/2015Petition for Review #2 Petition for Review filed on behalf of Respondent/Cross-Petitioner Laddex, LTD.
05/04/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of BP America Production Company.
03/31/2015Call received Call received from attorney Brian Farabough on behalf of Laddex, Ltd.  Mr. Farabough indicated that Laddex, Ltd. will be filing an extension of time to file a cross petition for review or will be filing their petition for review no later than May 4, 2015.  
03/30/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Fie Petition for Review granted.  Petition due no later than May 4, 2015.  
03/30/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of BP America  Production Company
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/13/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BP America Production CompanyPetitionerMr. John Ben Blanchard
Ms. Susan A. Kidwell
James Russell Leahy
Alfonso Antroy Arreola
Mr. Conrad D. Hester
Mr. Charles R. 'Skip' Watson Jr.
Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian
Delilah Banks
Mr. Mike A. Hatchell
Laddex Ltd.RespondentMr. John T. Smithee
Mr. Ronald D. Nickum
Mr. Joe L. Lovell
Mr. Brian W. Farabough
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
458 SW3d 683, 02-17-15 
7th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Mackey K. Hancock 
Trial Court Information
31st District Court 
Roberts 
Honorable Steven Ray Emmert 
1944 
Toni McClendon 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site