Supreme Court

Case: 15-0225    
15-0225
03/23/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
DENBURY GREEN PIPELINE-TEXAS, LLC 
TEXAS RICE LAND PARTNERS, LTD., ET AL. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/21/2017Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Tex.
02/16/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Rex H. White, Jr. in support of Respondents submitted by Rex H. White, Jr. of Austin, TX.
02/06/2017Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd., et al.
12/13/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Received.  Submitted by Edwin L. "Sandy" Meador, with Baker | Moran of Plano, Texas.
09/14/2016Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
07/08/2016Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerSupplemental Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
03/17/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Melvin Lipsitz in support of Respondents. Submitted by Amy Warr of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP.
03/07/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter Brief of Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. Submitted by Jim Wright, General Counsel of ETC of Houston, Texas.
02/29/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Barron & Adler, LLP in support of respondents. Submitted by Christopher Clough of Barron & Adler, LLP of Austin, Texas.
02/18/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association (TMLA) to urge the Court to deny Petition for Review. Submitted by Ricardo E. Morales of Person, Whitworth, Borchers & Morales, L.L.P. of Laredo, Texas.
01/22/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Tex.
12/23/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partner, Ltd., et al.
11/09/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
09/30/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Energy Transfer Partners, L.P.
09/14/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
09/12/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association. Submitted by Jason Boatright of Dallas, Texas.
09/04/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd., James E. Holland, and David C. Holland.
07/07/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Plains Pipeline L.P.  Filed by: Jane Langdell Robinson, State Bar. No. 24062970, Foster C. Johnson, State Bar. No. 24076463, AHMAD, ZAVITSANOS, ANAIPAKOS, ALAVI & MENSING, P.C., 1221 McKinney Street, 34th Floor, Houston, Texas 77010, 713-655-1101, 713-655-0062 Facsimile, jrobinson@azalaw.com.
06/29/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Gas Processors Association.
06/23/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Valero Refining – Texas, L.P., Enterprise Products Operating LLC; Explorer Pipeline Company, Sunoco Pipeline L.P., Shell Pipeline Company LP and Koch Pipeline Company, L.P. in support of petitioners. Submitted by Stephen K. Carroll of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP of Houston Texas.
06/17/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of EnLink Midstream Operating, LP.
06/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter filed on behalf fo TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, LP. Filed by Stacey Van Camp.
06/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by attorney, George S. Christian.
06/08/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Pipeline Association.
06/03/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/07/2017Revised issuedIssuedThe Court's opinion issued January 6, 2017 is revised.
04/07/2017Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting.(Justice Guzman not sitting on rehearing)
(4/7/2017 4:02:20 PM) 150225cr.pdf
02/21/2017Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Tex.
02/16/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Rex H. White, Jr. in support of Respondents submitted by Rex H. White, Jr. of Austin, TX.
02/07/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than February 22, 2017.
02/06/2017Case forwarded to Court  
02/06/2017Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd., et al.
01/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing granted.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Rehearing is due February 6, 2017.  
01/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd., et al.
01/06/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
01/06/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed, trial court judgment reinstatedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and reinstates the trial court's judgment. Justice Green delivered the opinion of the Court in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Willett, Justice Guzman, Justice Lehrmann, Justice Boyd, Justice Devine, and Justice Brown joined. Justice Johnson joined in the judgment only.
12/13/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter Received.  Submitted by Edwin L. "Sandy" Meador, with Baker | Moran of Plano, Texas.
09/15/2016Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Marie R. Yeates; Argued on behalf of respondent by William Christian
09/14/2016Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
07/19/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form of respondent, Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd, et al. Argument will be presented by: William Christian of Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, PC, Austin, Texas.
07/11/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Marie R. Yeates of Vinson & Elkins LLP.
07/08/2016Supplemental Brief filed Supplemental Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
07/08/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 15, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
04/01/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted[Note: The date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.]
04/01/2016Petition for Review granted  
03/17/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Melvin Lipsitz in support of Respondents. Submitted by Amy Warr of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP.
03/07/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedFiling grantedAmicus Letter Brief of Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. Submitted by Jim Wright, General Counsel of ETC of Houston, Texas.
02/29/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Barron & Adler, LLP in support of respondents. Submitted by Christopher Clough of Barron & Adler, LLP of Austin, Texas.
02/18/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association (TMLA) to urge the Court to deny Petition for Review. Submitted by Ricardo E. Morales of Person, Whitworth, Borchers & Morales, L.L.P. of Laredo, Texas.
01/22/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Tex.
12/29/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Thirty-Day Extension of Time to File Reply Brief granted.  Petitioner's brief due no later than February 8, 2016.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
12/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC
12/23/2015Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partner, Ltd., et al.
11/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partner, Ltd. James E. Holland, and David C. Holland, has been granted. Respondent's Brief on the Merits is due on December 23, 2015. Reply Brief is due January 7, 2016.
11/24/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partner, Ltd. James E. Holland, and David C. Holland.
11/09/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
10/16/2015Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.

SEALED EXHIBITS (LARGE WHITE ENVELOPE)
10/14/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 9th COA
10/09/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested: Petitioner’s brief due no later than November 9, 2015, Response brief due November 30, 2015, Reply brief due December 15, 2015.
09/30/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Energy Transfer Partners, L.P.
09/25/2015Motion to dismiss disposedFiling grantedrespondent Mike Latta’s motion to dismiss him from this case granted
09/18/2015Miscellaneous Motion Motion to Dismiss Respondent Mike Latta from appeal.
09/14/2015Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
09/12/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association. Submitted by Jason Boatright of Dallas, Texas.
09/04/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review, filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd., James E. Holland, and David C. Holland.
08/07/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Review due no later than September 8, 2015.
07/07/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Plains Pipeline L.P.  Filed by: Jane Langdell Robinson, State Bar. No. 24062970, Foster C. Johnson, State Bar. No. 24076463, AHMAD, ZAVITSANOS, ANAIPAKOS, ALAVI & MENSING, P.C., 1221 McKinney Street, 34th Floor, Houston, Texas 77010, 713-655-1101, 713-655-0062 Facsimile, jrobinson@azalaw.com.
07/07/2015Case forwarded to Court  
07/02/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd. James E. Holland, and David C. Holland.
06/29/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Gas Processors Association.
06/23/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Valero Refining – Texas, L.P., Enterprise Products Operating LLC; Explorer Pipeline Company, Sunoco Pipeline L.P., Shell Pipeline Company LP and Koch Pipeline Company, L.P. in support of petitioners. Submitted by Stephen K. Carroll of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP of Houston Texas.
06/17/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of EnLink Midstream Operating, LP.
06/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter filed on behalf fo TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, LP. Filed by Stacey Van Camp.
06/08/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter filed on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by attorney, George S. Christian.
06/08/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Pipeline Association.
06/03/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
03/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due June 3, 2015.
03/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Thirty-Day Extension of Time to File Petition for Review. On behalf of Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/07/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Plains Pipeline L.P.Amicus CuriaeMs. Jane Langdell Robinson
Mr. Foster Calhoun Johnson
Baker | MoranAmicus CuriaeEdwin L. Meador
Texas Pipeline AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Marnie A. McCormick
Mr. James E. Mann
TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, LPAmicus CuriaeStacey Van Camp
Holland, James E.RespondentMr. William Gerow Christian
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. Terry W. Wood
White, Junior, Rex H.Amicus CuriaeMr. Rex H. White Jr.
Enterprise Products Operating LLCAmicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll  
Koch Pipeline Company, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll  
Texas Civil Justice LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
Holland, David C.RespondentMs. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. William Gerow Christian
Mr. Terry W. Wood
Lipsitz, MelvinAmicus CuriaeMs. Amy Warr
Energy Transfer Partners, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. James Marion Wright Jr.
Valero Refining – Texas, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll  
Texas Land and Mineral Owners Association (TMLA)Amicus CuriaeMr. Ricardo E. Morales
Energy Transfer Partners, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. James Marion Wright Jr.
Shell Pipeline Company LPAmicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll  
Sunoco Pipeline L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll  
Latta, MikeRespondent 
Denbury Green Pipeline-Texas, LLCPetitionerMs. Marie R. Yeates
Mr. J. Eric Pardue  
Mr. Michael A. Heidler
Mr. Thomas A. Zabel
Mr. George R. Murphy
Ms. Nancy Hahn Elliott  
Texas Rice Land Partners, Inc.RespondentMr. William Gerow Christian
Mr. Terry W. Wood
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Gas Processors AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Robert R. Reis
Barron & Adler, LLPAmicus CuriaeMr. Christopher M. Clough
Explorer Pipeline CompanyAmicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll  
Texas Oil & Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Jason Everett Boatright
EnLink Midstream Operating, LPAmicus CuriaeMr. James Bristow
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
457 SW3d 115, 02-12-15 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Steve McKeithen 
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court 
Jefferson 
Honorable Donald J. Floyd 
E-181,923 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site