Supreme Court

Case: 15-0083    
15-0083
01/30/2015
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
M&F WORLDWIDE CORP., MCG INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS INC., MAFCO WORLDWIDE CORP., MAFCO CONSOLIDATED GROUP LLC, AND PCT INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS INC. 
PEPSI-COLA METROPOLITAN BOTTLING COMPANY, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/24/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
08/25/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Pepsi-Cola Metro. Bottling Co., Inc. (FILED UNDER SEAL)
08/05/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp.
04/28/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioner M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
04/13/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Company, Inc.
01/30/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
03/30/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Provided Mr. Heidler with an estimate of items included in the Bill of Costs.
03/03/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
03/03/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed and remanded to Court of AppealsThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court for further proceedings. Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court.
(3/3/2017 3:46:25 PM) 150083.pdf, 15-0083.jmt.pdf
10/03/2016Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Harry M. Reasoner; Argued on behalf of respondent by Allyson N. Ho
09/02/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Harry M. Reasoner on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
09/02/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Company, Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by Counsel Allyson Ho of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP of Dallas, Texas.
07/22/2016Submission resetCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been reset for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 3, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes.
07/15/2016Motion to re-set submission date disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument granted
07/12/2016Motion to re-set submission date filed. Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
07/08/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 14, 2016.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/24/2016Petition for Review granted  
06/24/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
09/24/2015Reply Brief Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
08/27/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due September 24, 2015.
08/27/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
08/25/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Pepsi-Cola Metro. Bottling Co., Inc. (FILED UNDER SEAL)
08/21/2015Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court disposed.Filing grantedRespondent's Unopposed Motion to File Brief on the Merits and Appendix Under Seal granted
08/13/2015Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court filed Unopposed Motion to File Brief on the Merits and Appendix Under Seal.
08/05/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp.
08/03/2015Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
06/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due August 5, 2015; Respondent's brief is due August 25, 2015; and Reply brief is due September 9, 2015.
06/08/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
06/05/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
06/05/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than July 6, 2015; Response brief due July 27, 2015; Reply brief due August 11, 2015
04/28/2015Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioner M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
04/13/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Company, Inc.
03/13/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Review due no later than April 13, 2015.
02/10/2015Case forwarded to Court  
02/03/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Co., Inc.
01/30/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of M&F Worldwide Corp., et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/13/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Company, Inc.RespondentDavid Jack Levy
Ms. Allyson Newton Ho
Mr. Winstol D. Carter Jr.
Mr. John M. Deck
Mafco Worldwide Corp.PetitionerMr. Michael Andrew Heidler
Ms. Deborah C. Milner
Mr. J. Eric Pardue  
Mr. Harry M. Reasoner
PCT International Holdings Inc.PetitionerMr. Michael Andrew Heidler
Mr. J. Eric Pardue  
Ms. Deborah C. Milner
Mr. Harry M. Reasoner
Mafco Consolidated Group LLCPetitionerMr. Harry M. Reasoner
Mr. J. Eric Pardue  
Mr. Michael Andrew Heidler
Ms. Deborah C. Milner
MCG Intermediate Holdings Inc.PetitionerMs. Deborah C. Milner
Mr. J. Eric Pardue  
Mr. Michael Andrew Heidler
Mr. Harry M. Reasoner
M&F Worldwide Corp.PetitionerMr. J. Eric Pardue  
Ms. Deborah C. Milner
Mr. Harry M. Reasoner
Mr. Michael Andrew Heidler
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
453 SW3d 492, 12-18-14 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sharon Sue Mccally 
Trial Court Information
80th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Lawrence David Weiman 
2011-77606 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site