Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-18-00843-CV    
14-18-00843-CV
09/27/2018
Mandamus
In re Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/28/2018Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/2018Case stored 
10/26/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
10/26/2018Motion for rehearing due 
10/11/2018Memorandum opinion issuedDENIED
10/10/2018Submitted 
10/10/2018Case ready to be set 
09/28/2018Record filed 
09/28/2018Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/2018Case StoredCase stored
10/28/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.RelatorJoshua C. Anderson
Yanez, Jesus MReal party in interestJames Amaro
Ashlee Dunham
Trial Court Information
164th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 164th District Court 
2016-88245-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site