Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00981-CV    
14-17-00981-CV
12/19/2017
Governmental Immunity
Jerry Sanchez, Timothy Wiliams, and Jose Estrada 
James Daniel Boone 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/16/2018Reply brief filedAppellee
03/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
02/13/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/10/2018Submitted 
05/08/2018Letter filed 
05/01/2018Motion disposedTAKEN WITH THE CASE
04/09/2018Motion filed 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/16/2018Reply brief filed 
03/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/23/2018Appellees brief due 
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/13/2018Case ready to be set 
02/13/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/05/2018Appellees brief due 
01/26/2018Letter filed 
01/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedGRANTED
01/19/2018Response due 
01/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
01/09/2018Order entered 
01/03/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/03/2018Docketing statement due 
12/29/2017Reporters record due 
12/29/2017Court fee due 
12/29/2017Record due 
12/27/2017Clerks record filed 
12/19/2017Fee paid 
12/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/19/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/19/2017Case began in court of appeals 
11/29/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/10/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerry Sanchez, Timothy Wiliams, and Jose EstradaAppellantCourtney Corbello
Boone, James Daniel AppelleeJames Daniel Boone
Trial Court Information
412th District Court 
Brazoria 
 
91722-1 
Jill Friedrichs 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site