Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00872-CV    
14-17-00872-CV
11/02/2017
Contract
Edwin Rodriguez and Tonya Rodriguez 
Texas Leaguer Brewing Company L.L.C. and Nathan Rees 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/12/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
02/23/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2018Submitted 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/12/2018Reply brief filed 
02/26/2018Appellees brief due 
02/23/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/23/2018Case ready to be set 
01/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/26/2018Appellants brief due 
01/23/2018Appearance of counsel 
12/27/2017Clerks record filed 
12/27/2017Clerks record due 
12/27/2017Record due 
12/04/2017Reporters record filed 
11/17/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
11/17/2017Docketing statement due 
11/13/2017Court fee due 
11/10/2017Mediation docketing statement returned 
11/10/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/03/2017Fee paid 
11/02/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
11/02/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/02/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/02/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/02/2017Case began in court of appeals 
10/26/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edwin Rodriguez and Tonya RodriguezAppellantCarolyn Roch Henneman
Texas Leaguer Brewing Company, L.L.C and Nathan ReesAppelleeDouglas A. Daniels
Trial Court Information
240th District Court 
Fort Bend 
 
17-DCV-240581 
Elizabeth Wittu 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site