Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00774-CR    
14-17-00774-CR
10/02/2017
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Leslie Jones Burks 
The State of Texas 
No 
9th Court of Appeals 
10/02/2017 
09-17-00357-CR 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
01/10/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/17/2018Petition for discretionary review was not filed 
09/17/2018Petition for discretionary review due 
08/31/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
08/31/2018Motion for rehearing due 
08/29/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/17/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
08/16/2018Judgment Issued 
08/16/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/12/2018Order withdrawn 
07/12/2018Order entered 
05/24/2018Submitted 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/12/2018State brief due 
03/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/09/2018Case ready to be set 
02/09/2018State brief due 
02/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/11/2018Appellants brief due 
01/10/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018Appellants brief due 
12/13/2017Appellants brief due 
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/14/2017Clerks record due 
11/13/2017Clerks record filed 
10/11/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/09/2017Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk 
10/06/2017Exhibits filed 
10/02/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
10/02/2017Order enteredCase transferred to another COA
10/02/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase transferred to another COA
09/29/2017Reporters record filed 
09/29/2017Letter filed 
09/29/2017Letter filed 
09/25/2017Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk 
09/25/2017Trial court certification filed 
09/25/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
09/25/2017Trial court certification filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/10/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasTommy L. Coleman
Burks, Leslie JonesCriminal - AppellantLeslie Jones Burks
Mr. Albert J. Charanza Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law 
Polk 
Honorable Tom Brown 
2017-0228 
Sondra Hensarling 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site