Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00717-CV    
14-17-00717-CV
09/08/2017
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Polaris Guidance Systems, LLC 
EOG Resources, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/24/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
01/04/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
12/08/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/26/2018Submitted 
02/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
01/24/2018Document returned 
01/24/2018Reply brief filed 
01/23/2018Supplemental clerks record received 
01/08/2018Appellees brief due 
01/04/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/04/2018Case ready to be set 
12/08/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/08/2017Appellants brief due 
11/29/2017Reporters record due 
11/22/2017Clerks record due 
11/08/2017Clerks record filed 
11/07/2017Notice of late record 
11/03/2017Clerks record due 
11/01/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
11/01/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
10/30/2017Order entered 
10/19/2017Notice of late record 
10/18/2017Reporters record due 
10/18/2017Record due 
09/23/2017Docketing statement due 
09/23/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
09/18/2017Court fee due 
09/13/2017Fee paid 
09/08/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/08/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/08/2017Case began in court of appeals 
09/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/20/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/20/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EOG Resources, Inc.AppelleeLawrence F. Labanowski
Polaris Guidance Systems, LLCAppellantChristopher Douglas Collings
Trial Court Information
189th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 189th District Court 
2016-29381 
Amanda Lynn King 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site